EP2727242 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE AND METHOD FOR SUPPLYING ELECTRICAL ENERGY TO AN ELECTRICAL LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUSS, Dietmar Fichtelgebirgstr. 22 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | 02 /
FELDMEIER, Rudolf An der Forstbreite 25 93128 Regenstauf Eitlbrunn / DE | [2014/19] | Application number, filing date | 12728580.7 | 20.06.2012 | WO2012EP61854 | Priority number, date | DE20111078463 | 30.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011078463 | [2014/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013000794 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2727242 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2727242 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/725, H03K17/73 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
H03K17/725 (EP);
H03K17/73 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT EINER NETZSCHALTEREINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERSORGEN EINES ELEKTRISCHEN VERBRAUCHERS EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTES ÜBER EINE NETZSCHALTEREINRICHTUNG | [2015/04] | English: | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE AND METHOD FOR SUPPLYING ELECTRICAL ENERGY TO AN ELECTRICAL LOAD | [2014/19] | French: | APPAREIL MÉNAGER ET PROCÉDÉ D'ALIMENTATION D'UN CONSOMMATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE EN ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2014/19] |
Former [2014/19] | HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERSORGEN EINES ELEKTRISCHEN VERBRAUCHERS MIT ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 15.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2012 | AL | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MK | 10.06.2015 | MT | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | RS | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | SM | 10.06.2015 | IE | 20.06.2015 | LU | 20.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | FR | 10.08.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 20.06.2015 | ||
LU | 20.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 10.08.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 20.06.2015 | ||
LU | 20.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 10.08.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 20.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 10.08.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 20.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 10.08.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 20.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 10.08.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 20.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 20.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 20.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US4329630 (PARK JOHN N) [X] 1,4 * figures 2,3 * [A] 2,5 [I] 3; | [IA]US4412160 (KOJIMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [I] 1,3,4 * figure 1 *[A] 2,5 |