EP2718422 - CULTURE MEDIA FOR STEM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Nederlandse Akademie van Wetenschappen (KNAW) Hubrecht Institute Uppsalalaan 8 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEVERS, Johannes Carolus c/o Hubrecht Institute Uppsalalaan 8 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 02 /
SATO, Toshiro c/o Hubrecht Institute Uppsalalaan 8 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 03 /
HUCH ORTEGA, Meritxell c/o Hubrecht Institute Uppsalalaan 8 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 04 /
KARTHAUS, Wouter Richard c/o Hubrecht Institute Uppsalalaan 8 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | [2017/36] |
Former [2014/16] | 01 /
CLEVERS, Johannes Carolus c/o Hubrecht Institute Uppsalalaan 8 NL-3584 CT Utrecht / NL | ||
02 /
SATO, Toshiro c/o Hubrecht Institute Uppsalalaan 8 NL-3584 CT Utrecht / NL | |||
03 /
HUCH ORTEGA, Meritxell c/o Hubrecht Institute Uppsalalaan 8 NL-3584 CT Utrecht / NL | |||
04 /
KARTHAUS, Wouter Richard c/o Hubrecht Institute Uppsalalaan 8 NL-3584 CT Utrecht / NL | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/16] | Application number, filing date | 12729741.4 | 11.06.2012 | [2017/36] | WO2012IB52950 | Priority number, date | US201161520569P | 10.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161520569 P | GB20110011244 | 30.06.2011 Original published format: GB 201111244 | US201161571663P | 30.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161571663 P | US201161513461P | 29.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161513461 P | US201113194866 | 29.07.2011 Original published format: US201113194866 | US201261594295P | 02.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261594295 P | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012168930 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2718422 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2718422 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C12N5/071, C12N5/09, G01N33/50 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
C12N5/067 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/0688 (IL,US);
C12N5/0018 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P13/08 (EP,IL);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
C12N5/0676 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/0679 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N5/0683 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/0693 (IL,US);
G01N33/5005 (KR);
G01N33/5008 (IL,US);
C12N2500/38 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2501/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2501/119 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2501/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2501/15 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2501/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2501/345 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2501/392 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | C12N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | 09.01.2014 | ME | 09.01.2014 | Title | German: | KULTURMEDIEN FÜR STAMMZELLEN | [2014/16] | English: | CULTURE MEDIA FOR STEM CELLS | [2014/16] | French: | MILIEU DE CULTURE POUR DES CELLULES SOUCHES | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 21.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17189470.2 / EP3318627 | EP23205567.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | EE | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | EE | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | EE | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | EE | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO2010090513 (KONINK NL AKADEMIE VAN WETENSC [NL], et al) [XD] 1-62 * the whole document * [Y] 1-62; | [XP]WO2012014076 (KONINKLIJKE NEDERLANDSE AKADEMIE VAN WETENSCHAPPEN [NL], et al) [XP] 1-62 * the whole document *; | [XP] - TOSHIRO SATO ET AL, "Long-term Expansion of Epithelial Organoids From Human Colon, Adenoma, Adenocarcinoma, and Barrett's Epithelium", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, vol. 141, no. 5, doi:10.1053/J.GASTRO.2011.07.050, ISSN 0016-5085, (20110727), pages 1762 - 1772, (20110902), XP028325676 [XP] 1-62 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2011.07.050 | [Y] - SAIYONG ZHU ET AL, "Chemical Strategies for Stem Cell Biology and Regenerative Medicine", ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (20110420), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1146/annurev-bioeng-071910-124715, ISSN 1523-9829, pages 73 - 90, XP055047409 [Y] 1-62 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-bioeng-071910-124715 | by applicant | WO2009022907 | WO2010016766 | WO2010090513 | - BJERKNES; CHENG, METHODS ENZYMOL., (2006), vol. 419, pages 337 - 83 | - BAKKEBO M; HUSE K; HILDEN VI; SMELAND EB; OKSVOLD MP, "TGF-beta-induced growth inhibition in B-cell lymphoma correlates with Smadl/5 signalling and constitutively active p38 MAPK", BMC IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 11, page 57 | - DE GOUVILLE ET AL., BR J PHARMACOL., (200505), vol. 145, no. 2, pages 166 - 177 | - DREW A E ET AL., "Comparison of 2 Cell-Based Phosphoprotein Assays to Support Screening and Development of an ALK Inhibitor", J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2011), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 164 - 173 | - KORINEK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 275, pages 1784 - 1787 | - KIRIKOSHI H ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COM, (2001), vol. 283, pages 798 - 805 | - KESTUTIS PLANUTIS ET AL., BMC CELL BIOL, (2007), vol. 8, page 12 | - LM ET AL., ANGEW CHEM INT ED ENGL, (2005), vol. 44, pages 1987 - 90 | - LEOST, M ET AL., Eur J Biochem, BIOMOL INTERNATIONAL, (2000), vol. 267, pages 5983 - 5994 | - MEYER, L ET AL., CHEM BIOL, (2003), vol. 10, pages 1255 - 1266 | - MEIJER ET AL., TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2004), vol. 25, pages 471 - 480 | - LIAO ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2004), vol. 145, no. 6, pages 2941 - 2949 | - DONTU ET AL., BREAST CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 6, pages R605 - R615 | - HSIEH ET AL., MOL CELL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 16, pages 952 - 959 | - ROY PETTIPHER; TREVOR T. HANSEL; RICHARD ARMER, NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (200704), vol. 6, pages 313 - 325 | - MIROCHNIK ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 3, page E31052 | - NIU ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2010), vol. 29, pages 3593 - 3604 | - BOTTENSTEIN; SATO, PNAS, (1979), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 514 - 517 | - BREWER ET AL., J NEUROSCI RES., (1993), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 567 - 76 | - GREGOREFF; CLEVERS, GENES DEV, (2005), vol. 19, pages 877 - 90 | - BJERKNES; CHENG, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1999), vol. 1, no. 16, pages 7 - 14 | - CLARKE ET AL., CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, pages 9339 - 44 | - SATO, T ET AL., "Single Lgr5 stem cells build crypt-villus structures in vitro without a mesenchymal niche", NATURE, (2009), vol. 459, pages 262 - 265 | - BARKER ET AL., "Identification of stem cells in small intestine and colon by marker gene Lgr5", NATURE, (20071025), vol. 449, no. 7165, pages 1003 - 7 | - SATO T ET AL., "Paneth cells constitute the niche for Lgr5 stem cells in intestinal crypts", NATURE, vol. 469, pages 415 - 418 | - CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 8164 - 8170 | - ROBINTON ET AL., NATURE, (2012), vol. 481, page 295 | - MACCHIARINI ET AL., THE LANCET, (2008), vol. 372, no. 9655, pages 2023 - 2030 | - SAHA ET AL., CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL, (2007), vol. 1 1, no. 4, pages 381 - 387 | - SAHA ET AL., BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, (2008), vol. 95, pages 4426 - 4438 | - LITTLE ET AL., CHEM REV, (2008), vol. 108, pages 1787 - 1796 | - EVANS GS ET AL., J CELL SCI, (1992), vol. 101, no. 1, pages 219 - 31 | - FUKAMACHI H. J, CELL SCI, (1992), vol. 103, no. 2, pages 511 - 9 | - PERREAULT N; JEAN-FRANCOIS B, EXP CELL RES, (1996), vol. 224, pages 354 - 64 | - WHITEHEAD RH ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1999), vol. 117, pages 858 - 65 | - OOTANI A ET AL., NAT, (2009), vol. 15, pages 701 - 6 | - KORINEK V ET AL., NAT GENET, (1998), vol. 19, pages 379 - 83 | - PINTO D ET AL., GENES DEV, (2003), vol. 17, pages 1709 - 13 | - KUHNERT F ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 266 - 71 | - KIM KA ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1256 - 9 | - DIGNASS AU; STURM A, EUR J GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL, (2001), vol. 13, pages 763 - 70 | - HARAMIS AP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 303, pages 1684 - 6 | - HOFMANN C ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2007), vol. 132, pages 587 - 600 | - SASAKI T ET AL., EXP CELL RES, (2002), vol. 275, page 185 | - STINGL J ET AL., BREAST CANCER RES TREAT, (2001), vol. 67, pages 93 - 109 | - ROGLER G ET AL., SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2001), vol. 36, pages 389 - 98 | - BUSET M ET AL., IN VITRO CELLULAR & DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY: JOURNAL OF THE TISSUE CULTURE ASSOCIATION, (1987), vol. 23, pages 403 - 12 | - WHITEHEAD RH ET AL., IN VITRO CELLULAR & DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY: JOURNAL OF THE TISSUE CULTURE ASSOCIATION, (1987), vol. 23, pages 436 - 42 | - DEVENEY CW ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF SURGICAL RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 64, pages 161 - 9 | - PANG G ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1996), vol. 111, pages 8 - 18 | - LATELLA G ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COLORECTAL DISEASE, (1996), vol. 11, pages 76 - 83 | - PANJA A., LABORATORY INVESTIGATION; A JOURNAL OF TECHNICAL METHODS AND PATHOLOGY, (2000), vol. 80, pages 1473 - 5 | - GROSSMANN J ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 82, pages 262 - 70 | - GREGORIEFF A ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2005), vol. 129, pages 626 - 38 | - SATO T ET AL., NATURE, vol. 469, pages 415 - 8 | - LUSTIG B ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (2002), vol. 22, pages 1184 - 93 | - BARKER NET, NATURE, (2007), vol. 449, pages 1003 - 7 | - SATO T ET AL., NATURE, (2009), vol. 459, pages 262 - 5 | - VAN DE WETERING M ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 111, pages 241 - 50 | - DENU JM, TRENDS BIOCHEM SCI, (2005), vol. 30, pages 479 - 83 | - OTSUKA M., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2010), vol. 138, pages 1255 - 65,1265 EL-9 | - VAN ES JH ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 959 - 63 | - BARKER N ET AL., GENES DEV, (2008), vol. 22, pages 1856 - 64 | - ODZE RD, NAT REV GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL, (2009), vol. 6, pages 478 - 90 | - MENKE V ET AL., DISEASE MODELS & MECHANISMS, (2010), vol. 3, pages 104 - 10 | - SATO T ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 469, pages 415 - 8 | - DEY D ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, page E5329 | - GARRAWAY IP ET AL., THE PROSTATE, (2010), vol. 70, pages 491 - 501 | - WALEN KH, "In vitro cellular & developmental biology", ANIMAL, (2004), vol. 40, pages 150 - 8 | - HAYFLICK L., THE JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (1979), vol. 73, pages 8 - 14 | - BARKER N ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 449, pages 1003 - 7 | - SANSOM OJ ET AL., GENES DEV, (2004), vol. 18, pages 1385 - 90 | - GREGORIEFF A, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2005), vol. 129, pages 626 - 638 |