EP2708581 - PAINT BINDER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cuní Bravo, Jorge Plaza Conde Valle Suchil 3 28015 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Cuní Bravo, Pedro 834 Riverside Drive, Apt. 6D New York, New York 10032 / US | For all designated states Cuní Bravo, Montserrat C/ Antonia Mercé 2 28009 Madrid / ES | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Pons Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2014/12] | Pons Ariño, Angel Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Rubén Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 12730001.0 | 09.05.2012 | [2016/38] | WO2012ES70325 | Priority number, date | ES201130738P | 09.05.2011 Original published format: ES 201130738 P | [2014/12] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012152973 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | ES | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2708581 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2708581 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C09D11/00 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
C09D7/45 (EP,US);
A61M31/007 (EP,US);
C09D11/00 (US);
C09D11/06 (EP,US);
C09D11/12 (EP,US);
C09D167/08 (ES);
C09D191/06 (EP,ES,US);
C09D5/00 (ES);
C09D5/022 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LACKBINDEZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2014/12] | English: | PAINT BINDER COMPOSITION | [2014/12] | French: | COMPOSITION AGGLUTINANTE POUR PEINTURES | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2013 | Translation filed | 09.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2012 | AL | 21.09.2016 | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | ES | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | RS | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | IE | 09.05.2017 | LU | 09.05.2017 | MT | 09.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
TR | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.09.2016 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
MT | 09.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 09.05.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 09.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS53139717 (SANKYO CO) [X] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0750026 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-45 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 45 * * page 4, line 10 - line 14 ** examples 1-5; claims 1,3-5,8-10 *; | [X]WO0204004 (COLLABORATIVE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * page 2, line 22 - page 6, line 22 * * examples 1-3; claims 1,6-9,19,23,36-39,49,61 *; | [X]US6933014 (WYNNE JOHN H [US]) [X] 1-45 * page 4, line 34 - line 61 * * figures 1-5; examples 1-12; claims 1,4,6,7,11,14,15,22-28,34-43 * | Examination | US2011098397 |