EP2813018 - USER EQUIPMENT, NETWORK NODE AND METHODS THEREIN FOR DETERMINING A TRANSPORT BLOCK SIZE IN DOWNLINK TRANSMISSIONS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/18] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSSON, Daniel Hasseluddsvägen 26 186 53 Vallentuna / SE | 02 /
CHENG, Jung-Fu 1731 Mandan Place Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 03 /
FURUSKOG, Johan Igeldammsgatan 28 S-112 49 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
FRENNE, Mattias Arkeologvägen 20 S-754 43 Uppsala / SE | 05 /
KOORAPATY, Havish 13425 Kodiac Place Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2018/18] |
Former [2014/51] | Kargl, Verena Sabine Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 12730059.8 | 11.06.2012 | [2018/18] | WO2012SE50627 | Priority number, date | US201261595226P | 06.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261595226 P | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013119158 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2813018 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2813018 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
H04L1/0007 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/0003 (CN);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04L1/0015 (EP,US);
H04L27/2627 (CN,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0094 (CN);
H04W74/006 (US);
H04W88/08 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄT, NETZWERKKNOTEN UND VERFAHREN DARIN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER TRANSPORTBLOCKGRÖSSE BEI DOWNLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGEN IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2014/51] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT, NETWORK NODE AND METHODS THEREIN FOR DETERMINING A TRANSPORT BLOCK SIZE IN DOWNLINK TRANSMISSIONS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2014/51] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR, NOEUD DE RÉSEAU ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS SERVANT À DÉTERMINER UNE TAILLE DE BLOC DE TRANSPORT DANS DES TRANSMISSIONS DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS | [2018/18] |
Former [2014/51] | ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR, N UD DE RÉSEAU ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS SERVANT À DÉTERMINER LA TAILLE DE BLOCS DE TRANSPORT DANS DES ÉMISSIONS DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE D'UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 25.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15194504.5 / EP3043498 | EP23188185.5 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2012 | AL | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | PT | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | IE | 11.06.2018 | LU | 11.06.2018 | MT | 11.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Un PDSCH Transmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110885 UN PDSCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110215), vol. RAN WG1, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20110221, XP050490647 [I] 1-50 * section 1.4 * | [I] - CMCC ET AL, "Un TBS Determination", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110423_UN TBS DETERMINATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110112), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dublin, Ireland; 20110117, XP050490340 [I] 1-50 * sections 2,3 and 4 * | [A] - 3gpp Tsg-Ran, "3GPP TS 36.213 V10.4.0", (20111201), pages 34 - 39, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/36213.htm, (20120824), XP055036323 [A] 1-50 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON ET AL, "On enhanced PDCCH design", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-112928, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050538137 [A] 1-50 * sections 1 and 2 * | [A] - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "E-PDCCH design aspects", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-113174, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050538301 [A] 1-50 * sections 1,2,2.5 * |