EP2704725 - BOILED SUGAR SWEET COMPRISING NON-FRUCTOSYLATED -GALACTOOLIGOSACCHARIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olygose Parc Technologique des Rives de l'Oise 60280 Venette / FR | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELBAERE, François c/o OLYGOSE Parc Technologique des Rives de L'Oise BP50149 F-60201 Compiegne / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/11] | 01 /
DELBAERE, François 21 rue du Harlay F-60200 Compiegne / FR | Representative(s) | Louiset, Raphaël Dejade & Biset 35, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Louiset, Raphael Dejade & Biset 35, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12731078.7 | 28.05.2012 | WO2012FR51192 | Priority number, date | FR20110056555 | 19.07.2011 Original published format: FR 1156555 | [2014/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013011216 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2704725 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2704725 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/702, C07H3/06, A23G3/38, A23G3/42 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
A23G3/42 (EP,US);
A23G3/38 (EP,US);
A23G3/0019 (EP,US);
A23G3/36 (US);
A23G9/42 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SÜSSWARE AUS GEKOCHTEM ZUCKER MIT NICHTFRUCTOSYLIERTEN ALPHA-GALACTOOLIGOSACCHARIDEN | [2014/11] | English: | BOILED SUGAR SWEET COMPRISING NON-FRUCTOSYLATED -GALACTOOLIGOSACCHARIDES | [2014/11] | French: | BONBON DE SUCRE CUIT COMPRENANT DES -GALACTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDES NON FRUCTOSYLÉS | [2014/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 31.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2012 | AL | 18.03.2015 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | NL | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | RS | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | IE | 28.05.2015 | LU | 28.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.05.2012 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 28.05.2012 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2846518 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0720819 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2010109093 (DELBAERE FRANCOIS [FR]) [AD] 1-6 * pages 7,14 * * claim 4 *; | [AD]EP0611527 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [AD] 1-6 * abstract * * examples 1-3; claims 8,10,11,12 *; | [AD]EP0518770 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0094292 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Sugar Syrup with oligosaccharide", GNPD, Mintel, (201106), Database accession no. 1581907, XP002667896 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - PARK AH-REUM ET AL, "Galacto-oligosaccharide production using microbial beta-galactosidase: current state and perspectives", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (201002), vol. 85, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S00253-009-2356-2, pages 1279 - 1286, XP002667897 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00253-009-2356-2 | by applicant | US5314708 | EP0720819 | EP0954982 | EP0611527 | EP0094292 | EP0518770 | FR2846518 | WO2007017572 | WO2010109093 | - GIBSON GR ET AL., NUTRITION RESEARCH REVIEWS, (2004), vol. 17, pages 259 - 275 |