EP2718635 - ATTACHMENT AND SEALING SYSTEM FOR CREATING A SOLAR ROOF, AND SOLAR ROOF OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 avenue d' Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUCHE, Jean-Pierre 10 Impasse des Pins F-60150 Le Plessis Brion / FR | 02 /
ABICHOU, Mohamed 19 avenue du Maréchal Maunoury F-94130 Nogent Sur Marne / FR | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Galdeano, Sophie Marie Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Proprété Industrielle 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [2014/16] | Application number, filing date | 12731095.1 | 31.05.2012 | WO2012FR51220 | Priority number, date | FR20110054953 | 07.06.2011 Original published format: FR 1154953 | [2014/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012168627 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2718635 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2718635 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/04, F24J2/52, F24J2/46, H01L31/042, E04D13/18, E04D3/36, E04D3/06 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
H02S20/23 (EP);
F24S20/67 (EP);
F24S25/35 (EP);
F24S25/37 (EP);
F24S25/634 (EP);
F24S40/44 (EP);
F24S80/70 (EP);
H02S30/00 (EP);
F24S2020/13 (EP);
F24S2020/17 (EP);
F24S2025/021 (EP);
F24S2025/805 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGS- UND DICHTUNGSSYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES SOLARDACHES UND DAMIT ERZEUGTES SOLARDACH | [2014/16] | English: | ATTACHMENT AND SEALING SYSTEM FOR CREATING A SOLAR ROOF, AND SOLAR ROOF OBTAINED | [2014/16] | French: | SYSTEME DE FIXATION ET D'ETANCHEITE POUR LA REALISATION D'UNE TOITURE SOLAIRE, ET TOITURE SOLAIRE OBTENUE | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 28.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2012 | AL | 13.05.2015 | AT | 13.05.2015 | CY | 13.05.2015 | CZ | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | ES | 13.05.2015 | FI | 13.05.2015 | HR | 13.05.2015 | IT | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | MK | 13.05.2015 | MT | 13.05.2015 | NL | 13.05.2015 | PL | 13.05.2015 | RO | 13.05.2015 | RS | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | SM | 13.05.2015 | TR | 13.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | IE | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | LU | 31.05.2015 | BG | 13.08.2015 | NO | 13.08.2015 | GR | 14.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | PT | 14.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AT | 13.05.2015 | ||
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MK | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
TR | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
IE | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
LU | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AT | 13.05.2015 | ||
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
TR | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
IE | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
LU | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AT | 13.05.2015 | ||
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
TR | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
IE | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
IE | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
IE | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
IE | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2401290 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]); | [A]JPH06136895 (GANTAN BEAUTY KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2000064515 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2000096793 (DAIKEN TRADE & INDUSTRY); | [A]DE20209892U (MAEDER WOLFGANG [DE]); | [A]EP1734588 (WUERTH ELEKTRONIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP2023402 (TENESOL [FR]); | [A]FR2943369 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) | by applicant | US2006118163 |