EP2661669 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GESTURE BASED CONTROLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TiVo Solutions Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose CA 95002 / US | [2017/52] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states TiVo Solutions Inc. 2 Circle Star Way San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | ||
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states TiVo Solutions Inc. 2160 Gold Street P.O. Box 2160 Alviso, CA 95002-2160 / US | ||
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states TiVo, Inc. 2160 Gold Street, P.O. Box 2160 Alviso, CA 95002-2160 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYES, Robin 18379 Plymouth Drive Castro Valley, California 94546 / US | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12732016.6 | 05.01.2012 | WO2012US20306 | Priority number, date | US20110986054 | 06.01.2011 Original published format: US 986054 | US20110986060 | 06.01.2011 Original published format: US 986060 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012094479 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661669 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G11B27/00, G11B27/34, G11B27/10, G06F1/32, H04N21/41, H04N21/422 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP);
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G11B27/005 (EP);
G11B27/10 (EP);
G11B27/34 (EP);
H04N21/42224 (EP);
H04N21/44213 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/46] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR GESTENBASIERTE STEUERUNGEN | [2013/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GESTURE BASED CONTROLS | [2013/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR DES COMMANDES À BASE DE GESTES | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 05.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 12.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2010101872 (IKEDA TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5-7,11,12; | [Y]US2009179867 (SHIM JUNG-HYUN [KR], et al) [Y] 12 * paragraphs [0042] - [0045]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1662358 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] *; | [Y]WO2007089766 (APPLE COMPUTER [US], et al) [Y] 11 * figure 37 * | [Y] - Anonymous, "Yatse 2 : Open Source Media Center Remote control App for Touch Screen", (20101231), URL: http://forum.kodi.tv/printthread.php?tid=68936, (20170531), XP055377363 [Y] 3,5-7 * pages 1,23 * * pages 30,31 * | International search | [X]US2008225013 (MUYLKENS KOEN [BE], et al); | [X]US2008165141 (CHRISTIE GREG [US]); | [Y]US2008084400 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]); | [Y]US2009179867 (SHIM JUNG-HYUN [KR], et al) |