EP2661419 - HIGH PURITY E-1-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPENE AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 09.07.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Opposition rejected | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POKROVSKI, Konstantin A. Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Rajiv Ratna Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
SHANKLAND, Ian Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 04 /
TUNG, Hsueh Sung Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/46] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12732259.2 | 03.01.2012 | WO2012US20035 | Priority number, date | US20110984024 | 04.01.2011 Original published format: US 984024 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012094288 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2661419 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2661419 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07C19/10, C07C21/18, C07B39/00, C07C17/25 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
C07C17/206 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/361 (US);
C07C17/383 (KR);
C07C21/18 (KR);
C07B2200/09 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C19/10 (EP,US);
C07C17/206, C07C21/18 (US,EP);
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/46] | C07C17/20, C07C19/10, C07C21/18, C07B39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHREINES E-1-CHLOR-3,3,3-TRIFLUORPROPEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/46] | English: | HIGH PURITY E-1-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPENE AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2013/46] | French: | E-1-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPÈNE DE PURETÉ ÉLEVÉE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE PRODUIRE | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.04.2016
12.06.2017
WITHDRAWN ARKEMA France 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | 02
28.04.2016
06.06.2016
ADMISSIBLE Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 (sin número) Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | 03
29.04.2016
06.06.2016
ADMISSIBLE Goldbach, Klara Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.04.2016
12.06.2017
WITHDRAWN ARKEMA France 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 30 rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | ||
02
28.04.2016
06.06.2016
ADMISSIBLE Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 (sin número) Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
03
29.04.2016
06.06.2016
ADMISSIBLE Goldbach, Klara Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.04.2016
WITHDRAWN ARKEMA France 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 30 rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | ||
02
28.04.2016
ADMISSIBLE Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 (sin número) Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. San Luis Potosi / MX Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
03
29.04.2016
ADMISSIBLE Goldbach, Klara Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | 13.06.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.12.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.05.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/33] | 07.07.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 04.07.2018 | Appeal received No. T1742/18 | 04.09.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.05.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 07.07.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 03.07.2018 | Appeal received No. T1742/18 | 04.09.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.04.2020 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2020/16] | 03.05.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 07.07.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 03.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2012 | AL | 29.07.2015 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BE | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | RS | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | IE | 03.01.2016 | LU | 03.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 03.01.2012 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.01.2012 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.01.2012 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.01.2012 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 03.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6403847 (NAKADA TATSUO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005014512 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010059496 (ARKEMA INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2010062572 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US5710352 | US6274779 | US6844475 | US2009030244 | Opposition | EP0877009 | US6111150 | US6403847 | WO2005014512 | WO2005026082 | WO2007079431 | WO2008054781 | EP2103587 | WO2010059493 | WO2010062572 | WO2010123148 | US2787646 | US5710352 | US6844475 | WO2008045910 | US2009030244 | WO2011103035 | - "REVIEW OF THE HIERARCHICAL DECISION PROCEDURE FORPETROCHEMICAL PROCESSES", JAMES DOUGLAS, Conceptual Design of Chemical Processes, McGraw-Hill Book Company, (19880000), pages 406 - 407, XP055277343 |