EP2661437 - 2,4-DIAMINO-6,7-DIHYDRO-5H-PYRROLO[2,3]PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS FAK/Pyk2 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centaurus BioPharma Co., Ltd. Building No. 16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No. 3, Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | [2018/45] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Centaurus Biopharma Co., Ltd. Building No. 16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No. 3, Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Dengming Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No. 3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 02 /
CHENG, Liang Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Xijie Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 04 /
HU, Yuandong Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 05 /
XU, Xinhe Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Zhihua Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Lipeng Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 08 /
WU, Wei Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 09 /
WANG, Shulong Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 10 /
SHEN, Yu Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 11 /
LI, Gen Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 12 /
WANG, Yin Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 13 /
ZHAO, Sheng Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 14 /
LI, Chonglong Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 15 /
TANG, Jia Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | 16 /
YU, Honghao Building No.16 Tsinghua Science Park Yuquan Wisdom Vale Minzhuang Road No.3 Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2018/45] |
Former [2013/46] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 12732345.9 | 07.01.2012 | [2018/45] | WO2012CN70122 | Priority number, date | CN20111002776 | 07.01.2011 Original published format: CN201110002776 | US201161457217P | 02.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161457217 P | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012092880 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661437 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2661437 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/505, A61P35/00, A61P29/00, A61P31/00, A61P37/02 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4523 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/541 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 2,4-DIAMINO-6,7-DIHYDRO-5H-PYRROLO-[2,3-]PYRIMIDINDERIVATE ALS FAK/PYK2-HEMMER | [2013/46] | English: | 2,4-DIAMINO-6,7-DIHYDRO-5H-PYRROLO[2,3]PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS FAK/Pyk2 INHIBITORS | [2013/46] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 2,4-DIAMINO-6,7-DIHYDRO-5H-PYRROLO[2,3]PYRIMIDINE COMME INHIBITEURS DE FAK/PYK2 | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 22.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2012 | AL | 07.11.2018 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | RS | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | FR | 07.01.2019 | IE | 07.01.2019 | LU | 07.01.2019 | MT | 07.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | BG | 07.02.2019 | GB | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | DE | 01.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 07.01.2012 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
FR | 07.01.2019 | ||
IE | 07.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
MT | 07.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
FR | 07.01.2019 | ||
IE | 07.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
MT | 07.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
FR | 07.01.2019 | ||
IE | 07.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
MT | 07.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
FR | 07.01.2019 | ||
IE | 07.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
FR | 07.01.2019 | ||
IE | 07.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
FR | 07.01.2019 | ||
IE | 07.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
FR | 07.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
FR | 07.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
FR | 07.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
DE | 01.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.01.2019 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03000695 (AVENTIS PHARMA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-14* claims 1-15, 17, 18, 22-25 *; | [Y]WO2005080393 (IRM LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1-5, 7-10 *; | [Y]WO2007140222 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1-7, 11-15, 17, 18, 22-24, 28-43 *; | [Y]US2010160356 (HEINRICH TIMO [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0016] , [ 0188] , [ 0189]; claims 1-3, 5-12; table 1 * | International search | [X]WO2004043367 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al); | [A]WO2009131687 (PORTOLA PHARM INC [US], et al); | [XP]CN102093364 (BEIJING SAILINTAI PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A] - DAVID HECHT ET AL., "A Novel In Silico Approach to Drug Discovery via Computational Intelligence.", J. CHEM. INF. MODEL., (2009), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 1105 - 1121, XP055091733 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ci9000647 | by applicant | WO03000695 | WO2004043367 | WO2005080393 | WO2007140222 | WO2009131687 | US2010160356 | - BEVIGLIA ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (2003), vol. 373, pages 201 - 210 | - SMITH ET AL., MELANOMA RES., (2005), vol. 15, pages 357 - 362 | - HAIDER ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 11, pages 8829 - 8836 | - VAN NIMWEGEN ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, pages 4698 - 4706 | - MITRA ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2006), vol. 25, pages 4429 - 4440 | - XU ET AL., CELL GROWTH AND DIFF., (1996), vol. 7, pages 413 - 418 | - CAREY; SUNDBERG, ADVANCED ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. A | - ADVANCED ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, PLENUM PRESS, (2001), vol. B | - VOGEL'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF PRACTICAL ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, LONGMAN SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL LTD., (1991), pages 809 - 816 | - HELLER, ACC. CHEM. RES., (1990), vol. 23, page 128 | - GOODMAN; GILMAN, The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, PERGAMON | - Remington's, Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - BERGE ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - Method in Enzymology, ACADEMIC, (1985), vol. 42, pages 309 - 396 | - "Design and Application of Prodrugs", BUNDGAARD, H., A Textbook ofDrug Design and Development, (1991), pages 113 - 191 | - BUNDGAARD, H., ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEW, (1992), vol. 8, pages 1 - 38 |