EP2726111 - MICROBUBBLE GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Of Leeds Leeds LS2 9JT / GB | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEYMAN, Sally Anne School of Physics and Astronomy University of Leeds Woodhouse Lane Leeds LS2 9JT / GB | 02 /
ABOU-SALEH, Radwa Hassan School of Physics and Astronomy University of Leeds Woodhouse Lane Leeds LS2 9JT / GB | 03 /
EVANS, Stephen Derek School of Physics and Astronomy University of Leeds Woodhouse Lane Leeds LS2 9JT / GB | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | HGF Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2014/19] | Drysdale, Douglas Standen Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | Application number, filing date | 12733203.9 | 29.06.2012 | [2018/36] | WO2012GB51524 | Priority number, date | GB20110011082 | 29.06.2011 Original published format: GB 201111082 | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013001309 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2726111 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2726111 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/22, B01J13/04, A61K9/50, C09B67/02, B05B7/04, B05B1/06, B01F3/04, // A61K9/127 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
B01J13/04 (EP,US);
B01F23/29 (US);
A61K9/1271 (EP,US);
A61K9/5015 (EP,US);
B05B1/06 (EP,US);
B05B7/0458 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | A61K49/22, B01J13/04, A61K9/50, C09B67/02, B05B7/04, B05B1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON MIKROBLASEN | [2018/16] | English: | MICROBUBBLE GENERATION | [2014/19] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE MICROBULLES | [2014/19] |
Former [2014/19] | ERZEUGUNG VON MIKROBLÄSCHEN | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 21.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2012 | AL | 05.09.2018 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | IT | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | MT | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | NO | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
MT | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2006167612 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-7,16,17,19,22 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0023] - [0030] - [0049] , [0050] , [0057] , [0058] , [0133] * * figures 3,4 * [I] 8; | [X]JP2008114098 (SANYO FACILITIES INDUSTRY CO L) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0026] * * figure 1 *; | [X]KR100902136B (LEEMCO CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0007] , [0013] , [0018] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2011045095 (HETTIARACHCHI KANAKA [US], et al) [A] 1-33,38 * paragraphs [0051] - [0055] - [0071] - [0075] - [0110] * * figures 1,2,5-8,13,14,16 * * claims 1-18 *; | [A] - Kanaka Hettiarachchi ET AL, "Controllable Microfluidic Synthesis of Multiphase Drug-Carrying Lipospheres for Site-Targeted Therapy", Chemical Engineers Biotechnol. Prog, doi:10.1021/bp.214, (20090101), pages 938 - 945, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1002/btpr.214/asset/214_ftp.pdf?v=1&t=hnoozwam&s=ef8a6a3732b013308e575342b1c1a23a85422b55, (20131106), XP055087013 [A] 1-33,38 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/btpr.214 | [A] - TAN Y C ET AL, "Monodispersed microfluidic droplet generation by shear focusing microfluidic device", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL TRANSDUCERS, ELSEVIER S.A, SWITZERLAND, vol. 114, no. 1, ISSN 0925-4005, (20060330), pages 350 - 356, (20060330), XP027971421 [A] 1-33,38 * page 352 * * figure 2 * | [A] - KANAKA HETTIARACHCHI ET AL, "Formulation of Monodisperse Contrast Agents in Microfluidic Systems for Ultrasonic Imaging", MICROTECHNOLOGIES IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, 2006 INTERNATIONAL CONFEREN CE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060501), ISBN 978-1-4244-0337-0, pages 230 - 232, XP031120986 [A] 1-33,38 * the whole document * | [A] - FU-CHE CHANG ET AL, "Controlled double emulsification utilizing 3D PDMS microchannels", JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS & MICROENGINEERING, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20080601), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0960-1317, page 65018, XP020136896 [A] 1-33,38 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2009098168 | - KLIBANOV, MED BIOL ENG COMPUT, (2009), vol. 47, pages 875 - 882 | - KLIBANOV, BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (2005), vol. 16, pages 9 - 17 | - BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (2007), vol. 18, page 101 | - SOFT MATTER, (2010), vol. 6, page 6036 | - ADV. FUNCT. MATER., (2007), vol. 17, page 1910 | - ELECTROCHIM. ACTA, (2005), vol. 50, page 4248 | - ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2004), vol. 43, page 1265 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, page 6492 | - J. PHYS. CHEM. A., (2007), vol. 111, page 12372 | - BIOPHYS. J., (2009), vol. 96, page 1554 | - KANAKA HETTIARACHCHI; ESRA TALU; MARJORIE L. LONGO; PAUL A. DAYTON; ABRAHAM P. LEE, LAB ON A CHIP, (2007), vol. 7, pages 463 - 468 | - M. J. K. BLOMLEY; J. C. COOKE; E. C. UNGER; M. J. MONAGHAN; D. O. COSGROVE, BRITISH MEDICAL JOURNAL, (2001), vol. 322, pages 1222 - 1225 | - E. STRIDE; N. SAFFARI, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS PART H-JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 217, pages 429 - 447 | - S. HERNOT; A. L. KLIBANOV, ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (2008), vol. 60, pages 1153 - 1166 | - S. QIN; C. F. CASKEY; K. W. FERRARA, PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 54, pages R27 - R57 | - K. W. FERRARA; M. A. BORDEN; H. ZHANG, ACCOUNTS OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, (2009), vol. 42, pages 881 - 892 | - Y. LIU; H. MIYOSHI; M. NAKAMURA, JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 114, pages 89 - 99 | - S. TINKOV; C. COESTER; S. SERBA; N. GEIS; H. KATUS; G. WINTER; R. BEKEREDJIAN, JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2010), vol. 148, pages 368 - 372 | - P. GARSTECKI; I. GITLIN; W. DILUZIO; G. M. WHITESIDES; E. KUMACHEVA; H. A. STONE, APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2004), vol. 85, pages 2649 - 2651 | - P. GARSTECKI; M. J. FUERSTMAN; H. A. STONE; G. M. WHITESIDES, LAB ON A CHIP, (2006), vol. 6, pages 437 - 446 | - M. HASHIMOTO; P. GARSTECKI; G. M. WHITESIDES, SMALL, (2007), vol. 3, pages 1792 - 1802 | - E. CASTRO-HERNANDEZ; W. VAN HOEVE; D. LOHSE; J. M. GORDILLO, LAB ON A CHIP, (2011), vol. 11, pages 2023 - 2029 | - M. A. HERRADA; A. M. GANAN-CALVO, PHYSICS OF FLUIDS, (2009), page 21 | - E. STRIDE; M. EDIRISINGHE, SOFT MATTER, (2008), vol. 4, pages 2350 - 2359 | - M. HASHIMOTO; S. S. SHEVKOPLYAS; B. ZASONSKA; T. SZYMBORSKI; P. GARSTECKI; G. M. WHITESIDES, SMALL, (2008), vol. 4, pages 1795 - 1805 | - M. HASHIMOTO; G. M. WHITESIDES, SMALL, (2010), vol. 6, pages 1051 - 1059 | - Y. C. TAN; V. CRISTINI; A. P. LEE, SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B-CHEMICAL, (2006), vol. 114, pages 350 - 356 | - E. TALU; K. HETTIARACHCHI; H. NGUYEN; A. P. LEE; R. L. POWELL; M. L. LONGO; P. A. DAYTON; IEEE, 2006 IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, VOLS 1-5, PROCEEDINGS, (2006), vol. 1-5, pages 1568 - 1571 | - E. TALU; K. HETTIARACHCHI; S. ZHAO; R. L. POWELL; A. P. LEE; M. L. LONGO; P. A. DAYTON, MOLECULAR IMAGING, (2007), vol. 6, pages 384 - 392 | - K. HETTIARACHCHI; E. TALU; M. L. LONGO; P. A. DAYTON; A. P. LEE, LAB ON A CHIP, (2007), vol. 7, pages 463 - 468 | - E. TALU; K. HETTIARACHCHI; R. L. POWELL; A. P. LEE; P. A. DAYTON; M. L. LONGO, LANGMUIR, (2008), vol. 24, pages 1745 - 1749 | - M. M. LOZANO; M. L. LONGO, LANGMUIR, (2009), vol. 25, pages 3705 - 3712 | - J. I. PARK; Z. NIE; A. KUMACHEV; E. KUMACHEVA, SOFT MATTER, (2010), vol. 6, pages 630 - 634 | - J. II PARK; E. TUMARKIN; E. KUMACHEVA, MACROMOLECULAR RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, (2010), vol. 31, pages 222 - 227 | - M. SEO; I. GORELIKOV; R. WILLIAMS; N. MATSUURA, LANGMUIR, (2010), vol. 26, pages 13855 - 13860 | - C. JIANG; X. LI; F. YAN; Z. WANG; Q. JIN; F. CAI; M. QIAN; X. LIU; L. ZHANG; H. ZHENG, MICRO & NANO LETTERS, (2011), vol. 6, pages 417 - 421 | - J. I. PARK; D. JAGADEESAN; R. WILLIAMS; W. OAKDEN; S. CHUNG; G. J. STANISZ; E. KUMACHEVA, ACS NANO, (2010), vol. 4, pages 6579 - 6586 | - M. H. LEE; V. PRASAD; D. LEE, LANGMUIR, (2010), vol. 26, pages 2227 - 2230 | - K. HETTIARACHCHI; A. P. LEE; S. ZHANG; S. FEINGOLD; P. A. DAYTON, BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (2009), vol. 25, pages 938 - 945 | - K. HETTIARACHCHI; A. P. LEE, JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 344, pages 521 - 527 | - C. JIANG; X. LI; Q. JIN; T. CHEN; Z. WANG; H. ZHENG, IEEE, (2010), pages 1 - 4 | - S. SRIVASTAVA; A. SANTOS; K. CRITCHLEY; K.-S. KIM; P. PODSIADLO; K. SUN; J. LEE; C. XU; G. D. LILLY; S. C. GLOTZER, SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 327, pages 1355 - 1359 | - S. HO; K. CRITCHLEY; G. D. LILLY; B. SHIM; N. A. KOTOV, JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 19, pages 1390 - 1394 | - Z. LI; C. DONG; L. TANG; X. ZHU; H. CHEN; J. REN, LUMINESCENCE, (2011), vol. 26, pages 439 - 448 | - T. FAEZ; D. GOERTZ; N. DE JONG, ULTRASOUND IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 37, pages 338 - 342 | - P. GARSTECKI; A. M. GANAN-CALVO; G. M. WHITESIDES, BULLETIN OF THE POLISH ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (2005), vol. 53, pages 361 - 372 | - A. M. GANAN-CALVO; J. M. GORDILLO, PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (2001), vol. 87, no. 274501, pages 274501 - 274504 | - J. E. MCKENDRY; C. A. GRANT; B. R. JOHNSON; P. COLETTA; J. EVANS; S. D. EVANS, BUBBLE SCIENCE ENGINEERING TECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 2, pages 48 - 54 | - E. BUCHNER SANTOS; J. MORRIS; E. GLYNOS; V. SBOROS; V. KOUTSOS, LANGMUIR, (2012), vol. 28, pages 5753 - 5760 | - C. A. GRANT; J. E. MCKENDRY; S. D. EVANS, SOFT MATTER, (2012), vol. 8, pages 1321 - 1326 |