EP2723665 - SHEET FEEDING APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSUGA, Kazuhiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 12733225.2 | 25.06.2012 | WO2012JP04093 | Priority number, date | JP20110140348 | 24.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011140348 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012176479 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2723665 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/14, B65H3/06 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
B65H1/14 (EP,US);
B65H5/06 (US);
B65H1/24 (US);
B65H3/0684 (EP,US);
B65H7/02 (US);
B65H2404/1521 (EP,US);
B65H2405/1117 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | BLATTZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/18] | English: | SHEET FEEDING APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2014/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN FEUILLES ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 05.08.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10316251 (RICOH KK) [Y] 2,3,7,8* abstract *; | [XI]US2003116906 (AMAMOTO HIDEKAZU [JP]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [I] 4,5,9,10; | [XY]JP2007269481 (CANON KK) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,7,8 | by applicant | JP2009007086 | JP2011140348 |