EP2731516 - LAPAROSCOPIC GRASPERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EON Surgical Ltd. 27 Ha'Barzel St. 69710 Tel Aviv / IL | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARIN, Danny 18 Ha'Geula St. 45272 Hod-Hasharon / IL | 02 /
BACHAR, Yehuda 9 Keren Hayesod Street 54051 Givat-Shmuel / IL | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12733513.1 | 11.07.2012 | WO2012EP63618 | Priority number, date | US201161506595P | 11.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161506595 P | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013007764 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2731516 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/29, A61B17/00 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/32 (KR);
A61B17/2909 (US);
A61B17/30 (KR);
A61B17/3478 (US);
A61B90/03 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00473 (US);
A61B2017/00862 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2902 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2912 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2917 (US);
A61B2017/2925 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Title | German: | LAPAROSKOPISCHE GREIFER | [2014/21] | English: | LAPAROSCOPIC GRASPERS | [2014/21] | French: | PINCES POUR LAPAROSCOPIE | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 28.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/28] | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5797939 (YOON INBAE [US]) [X] 19-23,25-27,29-31 * abstract * * column 4, lines 12-17 * * column 6, lines 34-57 * [I] 24; | [XI]DE19908593 (WINTER & IBE OLYMPUS [DE]) [X] 1,2,14-18 * abstract * [I] 3,5-11; | [I]DE20020192U (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1,2,5-11,14-18 * abstract *; | [X]EP1256323 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY [US]) [X] 1,2,9-11,14-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0025] *; | [I]US2006020287 (LEE WOOJIN [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-19,21-24,26-31 * abstract * * paragraph [0061] *; | [I]EP1707129 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [I] 1,2,4-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] - [0030]; claims 1,15 *; | [XI]US2007049966 (BONADIO FRANK [IE], et al) [X] 19-23,25-27,31 * abstract * [I] 24; | [I]DE202007009929U (SCHILLING HERMANN [DE]) [I] 19-31 * abstract *; | [I]US2008188891 (FRANK TIMOTHY GRAHAM [GB], et al) [I] 1,3,4,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0024] , [0106] *; | [A]US2010222800 (REBSTOCK DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 19-31* abstract * |