EP2721807 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A NOTIFICATION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REZENDE, Antonio Pedro 15 Acer Road Flat 8 London E83GX / GB | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Guilherme 103 Pritchards Road Flat 13 London E2 9AW / GB | 03 /
JUNKKONEN, Laura Vattukuja 2 FI-90460 Oulunsalo / FI | 04 /
PRAKASH, Priya 90A Camberwell Road London SE5 0EG / GB | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2018/30] |
Former [2014/17] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria Nokia Corporation IPR Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 12733787.1 | 05.06.2012 | [2018/30] | WO2012FI50552 | Priority number, date | US201161632809P | 17.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161632809 P | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012172164 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2721807 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2721807 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0488, H04M1/725 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M1/72484 (EP,US);
H04M2250/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/17] | H04M1/725, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES BENACHRICHTIGUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2014/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A NOTIFICATION MECHANISM | [2014/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE PROPOSER UN MÉCANISME DE NOTIFICATION | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 22.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.02.2018 | 07.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2012 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | MT | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.06.2012 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I] - Android Patterns, "Status bar. Event-driven notification.", (20110204), URL: http://www.facebook.com/notes/android-patterns/status-bar-event-driven-notification/193074337383906, (20121016), XP002685476 [I] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - Jim Blackler, "QuickCalendar, an application for Android written in Java", (20090130), URL: http://jimblackler.net/blog/?p=67, (20121016), XP002685478 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - Androidzoom, "TechCrunch", (2010), URL: http://www.androidzoom.com/android_applications/news_and_magazines/techcrunch_gucd.html, (20121017), XP002685477 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - Unitid and contributors, "Window shade", (20110303), Android patterns, URL: http://www.androidpatterns.com/uap_pattern/window-shade, (20121018), XP002685480 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - Jenneth Orantia, "How to get Android-style notifications on your iPhone", (20110520), URL: http://apcmag.com/how-to-get-android-style-notifications-on-your-iphone.htm, (20121016), XP002685479 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - Nithin M Warrier, "Tutorials for Android - Share and Enjoy", (20100426), Androidians, URL: http://smartandroidians.blogspot.nl/2010/04/expandablelistactivity-in-android.html, (20121017), XP002685482 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - Vince, "Samsung Galaxy Ace review", (20110406), Tracy and Matt Independent Technology News and Reviews, URL: http://www.tracyandmatt.co.uk/blogs/index.php/samsung-galaxy-ace-review, (20121018), XP002685483 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2009097555 | WO2010024986 | - Anonymous, "When new messages arrive... | The unofficial how-to blog for Thunderbird", (20060925), URL: http://tbirdhowto.wordpress.com/2006/09/25/when-new-messages-arrive/, (20140915), XP055140066 |