EP2664272 - ORAL IMAGING AND DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisya Advance 5-7 Nihonbashi Kobunacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8354 / JP | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URAKABE, Nobuchika c/o Kabushiki Kaisya Advance 5-7 Nihonbashi Kobunacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8354 / JP | [2017/18] |
Former [2013/47] | 01 /
URAKABE, Nobuchika c/o KABUSHIKI KAISYA ADVANCE 5-7 Nihonbashi Kobunacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8354 / JP | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/47] | Kurtz, Laurent Charles Edmond Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande-Armée BP 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12734447.1 | 11.01.2012 | WO2012JP50394 | Priority number, date | JP20110015764 | 11.01.2011 Original published format: JP 2011015764 | JP20110017192 | 12.01.2011 Original published format: JP 2011017192 | JP20110020197 | 13.01.2011 Original published format: JP 2011020197 | JP20110134633 | 16.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011134633 | [2013/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012096312 | Date: | 19.07.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664272 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/24, G02B23/24, A61C9/00, G06T7/38 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
A61B1/000095 (EP,US);
A61B1/0005 (EP,US);
A61B1/04 (EP,US);
A61B1/24 (US);
A61B1/247 (EP,US);
A61C19/04 (US);
A61C9/0053 (EP,US);
A61B1/00087 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/47] | A61B1/24, G02B23/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Title | German: | ORALES ABBILDUNGS- UND ANZEIGESYSTEM | [2013/47] | English: | ORAL IMAGING AND DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2013/47] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE ET D'AFFICHAGE DE LA VOIE BUCCALE | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2013 | Translation filed | 07.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 17.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 20.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP1120081 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0036] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0062] * * paragraphs [0087] - [0098] * [A] 2 [Y] 1,3-7; | [Y]US2004136580 (MATSUMIYA SADAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4-7 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] *; | [XY]US2008038688 (KOPELMAN AVI [IL], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * paragraphs [0054] - [0090] * [Y] 4-7; | [Y]JP2010214055 (SOUTH COAST DENTAL KK, et al) [Y] 3* paragraphs [0042] - [0045] * | International search | [Y]JP2001333898 (MORITA MFG); | [Y]JP2003299677 (TAKAMINE SHOICHI); | [X]JP2004202069 (MITUTOYO CORP); | [Y]JP2008125719 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]JP2008132336 (DEGUDENT GMBH); | [Y]JP2010214055 (SOUTH COAST DENTAL KK, et al) | [Y] - RIKIYA KIKUMOTO, "The mobile type teleradiology system contributes to a medical scene", GEKKAN SHIN IRYO, (20100723), pages 58 - 61 | by applicant | JPS62246347 | JPH0530402U | JPH05130991 | JPH1097404 | JPH1097405 | US5752827 | JPH10201757 | JP2001029315 | JP2001212161 | JP2002355262 | JP2005144171 | JP2005304600 | JP2005334426 | JP3131408U | WO2007063980 | JP2009516555 | - ZHANG, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (2000), vol. 22, no. 11, pages 1330 - 1334 | - MOTOKI ARAI ET AL., "Optimization of Correlation Functions and Subpixel Designation Formula in Block Matching of Images", RESEARCH REPORTS OF INFORMATION PROCESSING SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (2004), pages 33 - 40 | - JOURNAL OF THE IEICE, (2009), vol. 92, no. 6, pages 463 - 468 | - DENTAL MATERIALS AND EQUIPMENT, (2000), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 333 - 338 | - DESIGN WAVE MAGAZINE, (200812), pages 113 - 115 |