EP2870504 - TRANSPARENT DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Red Bull GmbH Am Brunnen 1 5330 Fuschl am See / AT | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEFER, Eike Bergstrasse 1 83454 Anger / DE | 02 /
VOGT, Rainer Olympiaring 40 83435 Bad Reichenhall / DE | 03 /
BRANKL, Michael Reitern 5 A-3672 Maria Taferl / AT | 04 /
ZEINER, Michael Schleierweg 33 85250 Altomünster / DE | 05 /
KELLER, Matthias Krankenhausstrasse 15 78187 Geisingen / DE | 06 /
SCHUBERT, Werner Hirtenweg 1A 82041 Deisenhofen / DE | 07 /
WARMUTH, Stefan Fasanenstrasse 22 82293 Mittelstetten / DE | 08 /
KLOIBER, Thomas Mariabrunner Strasse 92 81245 München / DE | 09 /
BLUME, Doris In den Baumgärten 4 99817 Eisenach / DE | 10 /
HERRMANN, Jan Zum Zimmergrund 25 98529 Suhl / DE | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Metten, Karl-Heinz Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12735214.4 | 09.07.2012 | WO2012EP02896 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014008903 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2870504 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, A47F3/04 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
F25D23/028 (EP,US);
G02F1/13 (EP,CN,US);
A47F3/0434 (US);
F21V33/00 (US);
F25D1/00 (US);
G02F1/133615 (EP,US);
G02F1/157 (EP);
G02F1/163 (US);
H10K59/8791 (EP,CN);
A47F11/06 (EP,CN,US);
A47F3/043 (EP,CN,US);
F25D2400/18 (EP,US);
F25D2400/36 (EP,US);
G02F1/1334 (EP,US);
G02F2201/44 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/86 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2015/20] | English: | TRANSPARENT DISPLAY DEVICE | [2015/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE TRANSPARENT | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 11.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5330261 (BENNETT JAMES L [US]) [Y] 23-30* column 5, lines 22-27; figure 10 *; | [Y]US5589958 (LIEB JOSEPH A [US]) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 52 - line 55 *; | [XY]US2004177624 (WO KI-CHEOL [KR]) [X] 31,32 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; figure 1 * [Y] 23-30; | [XYI]WO2005024501 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,7-17,19-22 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 4; figures 1A,2 * [Y] 6,23-30 [I] 18 | Examination | US2010177025 | by applicant | JPH0452488 | DE19828630 | US2010309420 | DE102011015949 |