EP2665727 - BICYCLIC CARBOXAMIDE INHIBITORS OF KINASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbvie Inc. 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASUDEVAN, Anil 105 13th Avenue Union Grove WI 53182 / US | 02 /
PENNING, Thomas Dale 321 Highview Elmhurst IL 60126 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Huanming 12 Amargosa Irvine CA 92602 / US | 04 /
LIANG, Bo 4-1701, Building 1 Xiangshuwan 2nd Residential Square Xiaoyingxi Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Shaohui 6-401, Building 13 Long Teng Yuan Er Qu Chang Ping District Beijing 102208 / CN | 06 /
WU, Fengchun 3-501, Building 9 Tianluyuan 1 Changping District Beijing 100028 / CN | 07 /
SHEN, Yan 3-501, Building 9 Tianluyuan 1 Changping District Beijing 100028 / CN | 08 /
LIU, Cuihua 3-401, Building 1 Longzeyuan East Changping District Beijing 100028 / CN | 09 /
ZOU, Zhenguang 8-1-602, Yard 6 Ximachang Road Fengtai District Beijing 100068 / CN | 10 /
PLIUSHCEV, Marina 337 Albert Dr. Vernon Hills, IL 60062 / US | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2013/48] | Application number, filing date | 12736701.9 | 20.01.2012 | WO2012CN00103 | Priority number, date | WO2011CN00109 | 21.01.2011 Original published format: PCT/CN2011/000109 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012097684 | Date: | 26.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2665727 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D471/04, A61K31/519, A61K31/4985, A61K31/4353, A61K31/5365, A61P35/00 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4353 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Title | German: | BICYCLISCHE CARBOXAMID-KINASE-HEMMER | [2013/48] | English: | BICYCLIC CARBOXAMIDE INHIBITORS OF KINASES | [2013/48] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE KINASES À BASE DE CARBOXAMIDES BICYCLIQUES | [2013/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 03.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/37] | 06.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ARDINI E ET AL, "Anaplastic Lymphoma Kinase: Role in specific tumours, and development of small molecule inhibitors for cancer therapy", CANCER LETTERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 299, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CANLET.2010.09.001, ISSN 0304-3835, (20101228), pages 81 - 94, (20101028), XP027451190 [A] 1-15 * compound - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.canlet.2010.09.001 | [A] - COOPMAN P J P ET AL, "The Syk tyrosine kinase suppresses malignant growth of human breast cancer cells", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (20000817), vol. 406, doi:10.1038/35021086, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 742 - 747, XP002168402 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35021086 | International search | [X]WO2009140128 (IRM LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2005009389 (EXELIXIS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2006087538 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [X]US2009099167 (BOLD GUIDO [CH], et al); | [X]WO2006106326 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [X]WO2006087530 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [X]WO2009126514 (IRM LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2008144253 (IRM LLC [US], et al); | [A]JP2004203748 (KISSEI PHARMACEUTICAL); | [A]JP2004238296 (KISSEI PHARMACEUTICAL); | [A] - HIRABAYASHI, A. ET AL., "A novel Syk family kinase inhibitor: Design, synthesis, and structure-activity relationship of 1,2,4-triazolo[4,3-c]pyrimidine and 1,2,4-triazolo[1,5-c]pyrimidine derivatives", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20080614), vol. 16, no. 15, pages 7347 - 7357, XP023610713 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2008.06.017 | [A] - HIRABAYASHI, A. ET AL., "Structure-activity relationship studies of 5-benzylaminoimidazo[1,2-c]pyrimidine-8-carboxamide derivatives as potent, highly selective ZAP-70 kinase inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20081105), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 284 - 294, XP025816121 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2008.10.070 |