EP2665422 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR TREATING ANEURYSMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endologix, Inc. 11 Studebaker Irvine, CA 92618-2012 / US | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERBOWY, Steve 3753 Nathan Way Palo Alto California 94303 / US | 02 /
DUERI, Jean-Pierre 231 Kensington Way Los Gatos California 95032 / US | 03 /
FOX, Jason 1555 Cherry Street 1 San Carlos California 94070 / US | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12736743.1 | 19.01.2012 | WO2012US21878 | Priority number, date | US201161434290P | 19.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161434290 P | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012100059 | Date: | 26.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2665422 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/14 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
A61B17/12136 (EP,US);
A61B17/12118 (EP,US);
A61B17/12195 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANEURYSMEN | [2013/48] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR TREATING ANEURYSMS | [2013/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE TRAITEMENT D'ANÉVRISMES | [2013/48] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 31.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007043420 (LOSTETTER TIMOTHY W [US]); | [A]US2007162106 (EVANS MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [A]US2009209855 (DRILLING SARAH ELLEN [US], et al); | [A]US2009216125 (LENKER JAY A [US]) |