EP2736896 - 3-OXO-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-INDAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS PARP-1 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nerviano Medical Sciences S.r.l. Viale Pasteur, 10 P.O. Box 11 20014 Nerviano (MI) / IT | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPEO, Gianluca Mariano Enrico Via Monza 38 I-23870 Cernusco Lombardone (LC) / IT | 02 /
BORGHI, Daniela P.O.Box N.11 Viale Pasteur 10 I-20014 Nerviano (Milan) / IT | 03 /
CARUSO, Michele Via Desiderio 3 I-20131 Milan / IT | 04 /
POSTERI, Helena Via Faraona 49/C1 I-21028 Travedona Monate (VA) / IT | 05 /
KRASAVIN, Mikhail Yurievitch Institute of Chemistry St. Petersburg State University 26 Universitetsky Prospekt Peterhof 198504 / RU | [2016/34] |
Former [2014/23] | 01 /
PAPEO, Gianluca Mariano Enrico Via Monza 38 I-23870 Cernusco Lombardone (LC) / IT | ||
02 /
BORGHI, Daniela P.O.Box N.11 Viale Pasteur 10 I-20014 Nerviano (Milan) / IT | |||
03 /
CARUSO, Michele Via Desiderio 3 I-20131 Milan / IT | |||
04 /
POSTERI, Helena Via Faraona 49/C1 I-21028 Travedona Monate (VA) / IT | |||
05 /
KRASAVIN, Mikhail Yurievitch Eskitis Institute for Cell and Molecular Therapies Brisbane Innovation Park Don Young Road Nathan, Queensland 4111 / AU | Application number, filing date | 12737279.5 | 18.07.2012 | [2016/50] | WO2012EP64054 | Priority number, date | EP20110175355 | 26.07.2011 Original published format: EP 11175355 | EP20120167336 | 09.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12167336 | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013014038 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2736896 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2736896 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D401/10, C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, A61K31/454, A61K31/4545, A61K31/4439, A61P35/00, A61P9/00, A61P25/00, A61P29/02 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D401/10 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 3-OXO-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-INDAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATE ALS PARP-1 INHIBITOREN | [2016/19] | English: | 3-OXO-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-INDAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS PARP-1 INHIBITORS | [2014/23] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 3-OXO-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-INDAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE PARP-1 | [2016/19] |
Former [2014/23] | 3-OXO-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-INDAZOL-4-CARBOXAMIDDERIVATE ALS PARP-1-INHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2014/23] | DÉRIVÉS DE 3-OXO-2,3-DIHYDRO-1H-INDAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA PARP-1 | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 04.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2012 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | LU | 18.07.2017 | MT | 18.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP0355970 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,5,16,23 * claims 1,2,6,8 *; | [A]WO2011006803 (NERVIANO MEDICAL SCIENCES SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007041357 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008084261 (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO02100833 | WO2008141385 | EP0355970 | WO2010133647 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2007), vol. 17, pages 6572 - 6575 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2010), vol. 53, pages 3517 - 3531 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2005), vol. 15, pages 5499 - 5503 | - SIMEONI M. ET AL., CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 64, pages 1094 - 1101 | - ANTICANCER DRUGS, (1996), vol. 7, pages 437 - 460 |