EP2734565 - RIGID PU-PIR FOAM WITH IMPROVED ADHESION IN COMPOSITE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2015/45] |
Former [2014/22] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABELS, Rene Leopold-Gmelin-Str. 100 51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
HAGEN, Torsten Oslenderstr. 17 45257 Essen / DE | 03 /
ROERS, Rolf An der Buchmühle 19 51519 Odenthal / DE | [2014/22] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2014/22] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12737551.7 | 19.07.2012 | [2016/01] | WO2012EP64159 | Priority number, date | DE20111079651 | 22.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011079651 | [2014/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013014055 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2734565 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2734565 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/40, C08G18/42, C08J9/14 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
C08G18/4018 (EP);
C08G18/4261 (EP);
C08G2110/0025 (EP);
C08G2115/02 (EP);
C08J2203/142 (EP);
C08J2203/184 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUR-PIR-HARTSCHAUMSTOFF MIT VERBESSERTER HAFTUNG IN VERBUNDELEMENTEN | [2014/22] | English: | RIGID PU-PIR FOAM WITH IMPROVED ADHESION IN COMPOSITE ELEMENTS | [2014/22] | French: | MOUSSE DURE DE PUR-PIR À ADHÉRENCE AMÉLIORÉE DANS DES ÉLÉMENTS COMPOSITES | [2014/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 06.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2012 | AL | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | IT | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | MT | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | GB | 19.07.2016 | IE | 19.07.2016 | LU | 19.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
GB | 19.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0821019 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 8 - page 8, line 7; examples 5,10; claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO2007025886 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 39; examples 1-8; claims 5-12 *; | [AD]WO2007025888 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 3, line 5 - page 9, line 26; example 1; claims 6-13 * | by applicant | DE1609668 | DE1247612 | WO2007025888 | DE19630283 | DE10145458 | EP1293524 | - Kunststoffhandbuch, vol. 7 |