EP2710615 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEMICONDUCTOR CERAMIC MATERIAL, SEMICONDUCTOR CERAMIC MATERIAL AND A SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | ||
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich Gmbh 52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITHAN, Christian Josef-Wimmer-Straße 9 52428 Jülich / DE | 02 /
KATSU, Hayoto Meyburginsel 31 52428 Jülich / DE | 03 /
WASER, Rainer Hochhausring 28b 52076 Aachen / DE | 04 /
DORNSEIFFER, Jürgen Krantzstraße 7 52070 Aachen / DE | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Naeven, Ralf König Naeven Schmetz Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Eupener Straße 2a 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Naeven, Ralf König & Naeven Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Kackertstrasse 10 52072 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12737704.2 | 16.05.2012 | WO2012DE100143 | Priority number, date | DE20111050461 | 18.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011050461 | [2014/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012155900 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2710615 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2710615 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01G23/00, C04B35/465, C04B35/468, C04B35/47, C04B35/49, C04B35/491, C04B35/622, C04B35/624, C04B35/626, H01C7/02 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
H01C7/025 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C01G23/006 (EP);
C04B35/465 (EP);
C04B35/4682 (EP);
C04B35/47 (EP);
C04B35/49 (EP);
C04B35/491 (EP);
C04B35/62222 (EP);
C04B35/624 (EP);
C04B35/62615 (EP);
C01P2002/54 (EP);
C01P2004/04 (EP);
C04B2235/3213 (EP);
C04B2235/3224 (EP);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3227 (EP);
C04B2235/3232 (EP);
C04B2235/3244 (EP);
C04B2235/3251 (EP);
C04B2235/3272 (EP);
C04B2235/3275 (EP);
C04B2235/3279 (EP);
C04B2235/3294 (EP);
C04B2235/401 (EP);
C04B2235/441 (EP);
C04B2235/5454 (EP);
C04B2235/663 (EP);
C04B2235/666 (EP);
C04B2235/768 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/13] | H01C7/02, C04B35/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBLEITERKERAMIKMATERIALS, HALBLEITERKERAMIKMATERIAL UND EIN HALBLEITER-BAUELEMENT | [2014/13] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEMICONDUCTOR CERAMIC MATERIAL, SEMICONDUCTOR CERAMIC MATERIAL AND A SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENT | [2014/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATÉRIAU CÉRAMIQUE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE, MATÉRIAU CÉRAMIQUE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE, ET COMPOSANT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 01.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2012 | AL | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | ES | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | LU | 16.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 04.03.2015 |