EP2732311 - ION DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Botley Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [2017/10] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Botley Oxford OX2 0SZ / GB | ||
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states Isis Innovation Limited Ewert House Ewert Place Summertown Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 7SG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROUARD, Mark The Physical and Theoretical Chemistry Laboratory Department of Chemistry University of Oxford South Parks Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX1 3QZ / GB | 02 /
VALLANCE, Claire Chemistry Research Laboratory University of Oxford 12 Mansfield Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX1 3TA / GB | 03 /
NOMEROTSKI, Andrei Department of Physics Denys Wilkinson Building University of Oxford Keble Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX1 3RH / GB | 04 /
TURCHETTA, Renato Science&Technology Facility Council Rutherford Appleton Laboratory Harwell Science and Innovation Campus Chilton Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0QX / GB | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Robinson, Simon John Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12738155.6 | 29.06.2012 | WO2012GB51518 | Priority number, date | GB20110011915 | 12.07.2011 Original published format: GB 201111915 | GB20110018614 | 27.10.2011 Original published format: GB 201118614 | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013007981 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732311 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/20 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H01J49/025 (EP,US);
G01T1/2006 (EP,US);
G01T1/20183 (EP,US);
G01T1/20185 (EP,US);
G01T1/20187 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Title | German: | IONENDETEKTOR | [2014/21] | English: | ION DETECTOR | [2014/21] | French: | DÉTECTEUR D'IONS | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2019 | 22.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/40] | 18.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2018 | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0177654 (STAR V RAY CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 11* page 2, line 6 - line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]US2005135535 (WALLACE STEVEN [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0097] *; | [A]WO2010057500 (SIEMENS AS [DK], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 12 - line 18 * * page 9, line 27 - line 33 *; | [XI] - MULLER A R ET AL, "A low-temperature proton detector for a neutron lifetime experiment", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS, AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NETHERLANDS, vol. 611, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.NIMA.2009.07.076, ISSN 0168-9002, (20091201), pages 289 - 292, (20090807), XP026778558 [X] 1 * page 289, column 2, line 22 - page 290, column 1, line 12 * [I] 15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2009.07.076 | Examination | WO2008048694 | WO2010070487 | - MULLER A R ET AL, "A low-temperature proton detector for a neutron lifetime experiment", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NL, vol. 611, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.NIMA.2009.07.076, ISSN 0168-9002, (20091201), pages 289 - 292, (20090807), XP026778558 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2009.07.076 |