EP2726363 - COLLAPSIBLE BOAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/19] | FOLDING TRANSOM FOR A COLLAPSIBLE BOAT | ||
[2020/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUDSON FAMILY LLC. 8118 Arroyo Circle Gilroy CA 95020 / US | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states Alex R. Kaye And Frances Kaye Trust 344 The Alameda De Las Pulgas Redwood City CA 94062 / US | ||
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Alex R. Kaye And Frances Kaye Trust 88 Shearer Dr. Atherton, California 94027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYE, Alex R. 344 The Alameda De Las Pulgas Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2021/15] |
Former [2014/19] | 01 /
KAYE, Alex R. 88 Shearer Dr. Atherton, California 94027 / US | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2022/08] |
Former [2014/19] | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12738298.4 | 29.06.2012 | [2022/08] | WO2012US45104 | Priority number, date | US201113174577 | 30.06.2011 Original published format: US201113174577 | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013003807 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2726363 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2726363 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B63B7/00, B63B7/08, B63B7/02 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
B63B7/082 (EP,KR,US);
B63B7/085 (EP,KR);
B63B2007/003 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | B63B7/00, B63B7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FALTBOOT | [2020/45] | English: | COLLAPSIBLE BOAT | [2020/45] | French: | BATEAU PLIANT | [2020/45] |
Former [2014/19] | FALTHECKSPIEGEL FÜR EIN FALTBOOT | ||
Former [2014/19] | FOLDING TRANSOM FOR A COLLAPSIBLE BOAT | ||
Former [2014/19] | TABLEAU ARRIÈRE REPLIABLE POUR BATEAU PLIANT | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 05.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2012 | AL | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | DK | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | FI | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | MT | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | TR | 23.02.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | NO | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | IE | 29.06.2022 | LU | 29.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
TR | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 23.02.2022 | |
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 23.02.2022 | |
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | FI | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2830308 (GREEN LELAND W) [X] 1-4,6,9,11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 15-25 * * column 2, lines 4-55 * * figures 2, 3, 8 * [I] 12; | [XYI]GB2013586 (LENNARD G A F) [X] 1,4-6,9,13,23 * abstract * * page 4, lines 1-24 * * figures 1, 6, 8 * [Y] 14-17 [I] 10; | [X]WO9003914 (MATTHEWS KEITH RAYMOND [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, lines 20-30 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0761530 (CITTADINI DANIEL [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 4 *; | [Y]US6007391 (EILERT JOHN R [US]) [Y] 14-17 * abstract ** figure 9 * | by applicant | US4556009 | US4660499 | US5524570 |