EP2736940 - PAPER STRUCTURES IMPREGNATED WITH POLYUREA, AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBACH, Rolf Hufelandstr. 69 51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
ARNTZ, Hans-Detlef Fliederweg 33 53797 Lohmar / DE | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12738470.9 | 25.07.2012 | WO2012EP64624 | Priority number, date | DE20111080090 | 29.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011080090 | [2014/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013017508 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2736940 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/64, C08G18/76, D21H17/57, D21H21/18, D21H25/06 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
C09D175/08 (EP,CN);
C08G18/10 (EP,CN);
C08G18/7671 (EP,CN);
C08G18/797 (EP,CN);
D21H17/57 (EP,CN);
D21H21/18 (EP,CN);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/302 (CN,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | MIT POLYHARNSTOFF IMPRÄGNIERTE PAPIERSTRUKTUREN UND EIN VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2014/23] | English: | PAPER STRUCTURES IMPREGNATED WITH POLYUREA, AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2014/23] | French: | STRUCTURES DE PAPIER IMPRÉGNÉES DE POLYURÉE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LEUR FABRICATION | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 07.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9307337 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 2; examples 1-16; claims 1-72 *; | [A]WO9305232 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 23; claims 1-41 *; | [A]WO9325384 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 18 * * page 8, line 2 - page 14, line 12; claims 1-21 *; | [A]US3953169 (IGARASHI SEIICHI, et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6372322 | US2744042 | US5008359 | US5292391 | US5332458 | US5580243 | US5140086 | US5580922 | DE102006016943 | DE102008033559 | DE102008051436 |