EP2729874 - METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR THE DYNAMIC MANAGEMENT OF SERVICES IN AN ADMINISTRATION CLUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull SAS Rue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/03] |
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states Bull SAS Rue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEGY, Virginie 5 allée des Anémones F-38640 Claix / FR | 02 /
FAVIER, Valérie 20 chemin des Ronzerettes F-38410 Saint-martin D'uriage / FR | 03 /
GILOT, Laurent 4 Impasse des Champs Elysées F-38190 Froges / FR | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Argyma 14 Boulevard de Strasbourg 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2022/28] |
Former [2014/20] | Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12738544.1 | 28.06.2012 | [2022/28] | WO2012FR51488 | Priority number, date | FR20110056235 | 08.07.2011 Original published format: FR 1156235 | [2014/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013007910 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2729874 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2729874 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48, G06F11/14, G06F9/50 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
G06F9/4856 (EP);
G06F11/1438 (EP);
G06F11/1484 (EP);
G06F9/5077 (EP);
G06F11/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR DYNAMISCHEN VERWALTUNG VON DIENSTEN IN EINEM ADMINISTRATIONSCLUSTER | [2014/20] | English: | METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR THE DYNAMIC MANAGEMENT OF SERVICES IN AN ADMINISTRATION CLUSTER | [2014/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR DE GESTION DYNAMIQUE DE SERVICES DANS UN CLUSTER D'ADMINISTRATION | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 05.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.03.2022 | 01.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2019 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.07.2022 | AT | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | ES | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | IT | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | NL | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 13.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2010058108 (NAMMATSU TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0089] - [0115] *; | [XI]US2010325471 (MISHRA RAJEEV [IN], et al) [X] 1,3,7,9,10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0072]; figures 2,3,5 * [I] 2,4-6,8; | [I]US7925923 (HYSER CHRIS D [US], et al) [I] 1-10* column 5, line 36 - column 7, line 12 *; | [I]WO2011051025 (IBM [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 16 * | Examination | US2010211829 |