EP2668033 - A MICROSTRUCTURE FOR FUSION BONDED THERMOPLASTIC POLYMER MATERIAL, AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dart Container Corporation 500 Hogsback Road Mason, MI 48854 / US | [2017/15] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states Microgreen Polymers, Inc. 7220-201st Street NE Arlington, WA 98223 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NADELLA, Krishna 3609 A Interlake Ave N. Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Vipin 14404 1st Ave NW Seattle, WA 98177 / US | 03 /
WANG, Xiaoxi 12424 54th Ave W. Mukilteo, WA 98275 / US | 04 /
HANKS, James 12016 1/2 32nd Ave NE Seattle, WA 98125 / US | [2014/14] |
Former [2013/49] | 01 /
NADELLA, Krishna 3609 A Interlake Ave N. Seattle, WA 98103 / US | ||
02 /
KUMAR, Vipin 14404 1st Ave NW Seattle, WA 98177 / US | |||
03 /
WANG, Xiaoxi 12424 54th Ave W. Mukilteo, WA 98275 / US | |||
04 /
HANKS, James 12014 1/2 32nd Ave NE Seattle, WA 98125 / US | Representative(s) | Pezzoli, Ennio, et al c/o Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini 40 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Pezzoli, Ennio, et al c/o Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini 40 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12739292.6 | 27.01.2012 | WO2012US22963 | Priority number, date | US201161436902P | 27.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161436902 P | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012103473 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2668033 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/18, B29C65/00 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
B32B3/02 (EP,US);
B32B3/10 (US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/823 (EP,US);
B29C65/8253 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/342 (EP,US);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/45 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/91411 (EP,US);
B29C66/91945 (EP,US);
B32B5/32 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/712 (EP,US);
B29C66/73772 (EP,US);
B29C66/73774 (EP,US);
B29K2105/046 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7132 (EP,US);
B32B2250/05 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0264 (EP,US);
B32B2266/08 (EP,US);
B32B2439/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2055/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/003 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2013/49] | B32B5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | MIKROSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN SCHMELZVERBUNDENES THERMOPLASTISCHES POLYMERMATERIAL UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2013/49] | English: | A MICROSTRUCTURE FOR FUSION BONDED THERMOPLASTIC POLYMER MATERIAL, AND RELATED METHODS | [2013/49] | French: | MICROSTRUCTURE POUR MATÉRIAU POLYMÈRE THERMOPLASTIQUE LIÉ PAR FUSION, ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 02.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 04.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 04.01.2016 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2017/04] | 01.03.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2044672 (STIROFILM SPA) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0329490 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* claims 1,3 * | International search | [Y]US3617311 (BELTLE ROBERT, et al); | [Y]US2004005449 (SUGIMOTO AKIO [JP], et al); | [X]US2009104420 (NADELLA KRISHNA [US], et al); | [Y]US2010028654 (TAKASE KENICHI [JP], et al) |