EP2668250 - PRODUCTION OF FUEL FROM CHEMICALS DERIVED FROM BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enlighten Innovations Inc. Suite 201, 1100 1st St. SE Calgary, Alberta T2G 1B1 / CA | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/01] | For all designated states Field Upgrading Limited Suite 201 1100 1st Street SE Calgary, AB T2G 1B1 / CA | ||
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states Ceramatec, Inc. 2425 South 900 West Salt Lake City, UT 84119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAVARAJU, Sai 9358 South 3110 West West Jordan Utah 84088 / US | 02 /
KARANJIKAR, Mukund 5257 Sandwell Drive West Valley Utah 84120 / US | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/17] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2013/49] | Camenisch, Andrew Richard Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12739864.2 | 24.01.2012 | [2019/17] | WO2012US22425 | Priority number, date | US201161436088P | 25.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161436088 P | US201161577496P | 19.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161577496 P | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012103135 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2668250 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2668250 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C10G3/00, C10L1/16, B09B3/00, C08B37/00, C07C51/00, C07C51/09, C07C51/41, C10L1/02, C25B3/00, C25B3/02, C25B9/08 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C07C51/09 (EP,US);
C10G3/00 (KR);
C25B9/19 (EP,US);
B09B3/00 (KR);
C07C51/00 (EP,US);
C07C51/41 (EP,US);
C07C51/412 (EP,US);
C08B37/00 (KR);
C10L1/02 (US);
C10L1/16 (KR);
C25B3/00 (EP,US);
C25B3/23 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C51/00, C07C59/185 (EP,US);
C07C51/09, C07C53/126 (US,EP);
C07C51/412, C07C53/126 (US,EP);
C07C51/412, C07C59/185 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2013/49] | C10G3/00, C10L1/16, B09B3/00, C08B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON BRENNSTOFFEN AUS AUS BIOMASSE GEWONNENEN CHEMIKALIEN | [2013/49] | English: | PRODUCTION OF FUEL FROM CHEMICALS DERIVED FROM BIOMASS | [2013/49] | French: | PRODUCTION DE CARBURANT À PARTIR DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES ISSUS DE BIOMASSE | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 24.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2012 | AL | 24.04.2019 | AT | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | DK | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | MK | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | NL | 24.04.2019 | PL | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | RS | 24.04.2019 | SE | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | SM | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | IE | 24.01.2020 | LU | 24.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.01.2012 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2020 | ||
LU | 24.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2020 | ||
LU | 24.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 24.04.2019 | |
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 24.04.2019 | |
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 24.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010324310 (DUMESIC JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 2-9,11-15* examples 1-11; claims 1-19 *; | [IY] - PANDE G S ET AL, "Studies on Kolbe's electrosynthesis", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, vol. 4, no. 2-4, doi:10.1016/0013-4686(61)80018-2, ISSN 0013-4686, (19610801), pages 215 - 231, (19610801), XP026739450 [I] 1,10,16 * abstract * [Y] 2-9,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0013-4686(61)80018-2 | [I] - J. HAUFE ET.AL., "Bifunktionelle Verbindungen durch Kolbe-Elektolyse", CHEMIE-ING. TECHN., (1970), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 170 - 175, XP002751054 [I] 1,10 * Page 170, left column, lines 1 - right colun, line 4; page 171, paragraph "Mechanismus der Kolbe Elektrolyse" first paragraph; schemes 1-4; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cite.330420404 | [I] - L. EBERSON, "Studies on the Kolbe Electrolytic Synthesis", ACTA. CHEM. SCAND., (1963), vol. 17, no. 7, pages 2004 - 2018, XP002751055 [I] 1,10 * page 2005, reaction scheme (5) and following lines of explanation the decarboylation; page 2009, paragraph A "the critical potential"; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3891/acta.chem.scand.17-2004 | International search | [A]US5841002 (HARRISON GEORGE EDWIN [GB], et al); | [A]US6238543 (LAW JR CLARENCE GARLAND [US], et al); | [A]US2005177008 (BALAGOPAL SHEKAR [US], et al); | [A]US2010258447 (FAN QINBAI [US]) |