EP2828174 - SELF-LUBRICATING SURFACES FOR FOOD PACKAGING AND FOOD PROCESSING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Jonathan, David 285 3rd Street, Apt. 843 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
DHIMAN, Rajeev 14 Persimmon Lane Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 03 /
PAXSON, Adam, T. 898 Massachusetts Ave. 8 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
LOVE, Christopher, J. 544 Woodland Circle Atlantis, FL 33462 / US | 05 /
SOLOMON, Brian, R. 11504 Evelake Court Rockville, MD 20878 / US | 06 /
VARANASI, Kripa, K. 31 Fletcher Avenue Unit 5 Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2015/10] |
Former [2015/05] | 01 /
SMITH, Jonathan, David 285 3rd Street, Apt. 843 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
02 /
DHIMAN, Rajeev 8 Island Hill Avenue No. 213 Malden, MA 02148 / US | |||
03 /
PAXSON, Adam, T. 48 Pearl Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
04 /
LOVE, Christopher, J. 544 Woodland Circle Atlantis, FL 33462 / US | |||
05 /
SOLOMON, Brian, R. 11504 Evelake Court Rockville, MD 20878 / US | |||
06 /
VARANASI, Kripa, K. 31 Fletcher Avenue Unit 5 Lexington, MA 02420 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12740419.2 | 13.06.2012 | WO2012US42326 | Priority number, date | US201261614941P | 23.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261614941 P | US201261651545P | 24.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261651545 P | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013141888 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828174 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D23/02, B08B17/06 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
B65D23/02 (EP,KR,US);
B65D25/14 (KR,US);
B65D85/72 (KR,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24397 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24405 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2443 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24521 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Title | German: | SELBSTSCHMIERENDE OBERFLÄCHEN FÜR LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNGEN UND LEBENSMITTELVERARBEITUNGSANLAGE | [2015/05] | English: | SELF-LUBRICATING SURFACES FOR FOOD PACKAGING AND FOOD PROCESSING EQUIPMENT | [2015/05] | French: | SURFACES AUTOLUBRIFIANTES POUR CONDITIONNEMENT ALIMENTAIRE ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE TRANSFORMATION DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 11.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2016 | Observations by third parties | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4069933 (NEWING CHARLES WESLEY) [A] 1,18 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 41; figure - *; | [A]US2002164443 (OLES MARKUS [DE], et al) [A] 1,18* paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0045] *; | [A]US2003096083 (MORGAN ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0040]; figure - *; | [A]US2005112326 (NUN EDWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0123]; figure - * | other | US6247603 | WO2010028752 | - T-S WONG et al., "Bioinspired self-repairing slippery surfaces pressure-stable omniphobicity", Nature, (20110000), vol. 477, pages 443 - 447, XP055025131 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10447 |