EP2729856 - INTEGRATED SIMULATION TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligrated Headquarters LLC 7901 Innovation Way Mason, OH 45040 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states Intelligrated Headquarters LLC 7901 Innovation Way Mason, OH 45040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGATO, William, A. 1069 Hayward Circle Milford, OH 45150 / US | 02 /
RESNICK, Brian, J. 4437 Bromyard Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/12] |
Former [2014/20] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstraße 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12740781.5 | 06.07.2012 | [2023/12] | WO2012US45737 | Priority number, date | US201113179195 | 08.07.2011 Original published format: US201113179195 | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013009610 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2729856 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2729856 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, G06F30/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G05B19/41885 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | G05B19/418, G06F17/50 | ||
Former IPC [2014/20] | G05B19/418 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE SIMULATIONSTECHNIK | [2014/20] | English: | INTEGRATED SIMULATION TECHNOLOGY | [2014/20] | French: | TECHNOLOGIE DE SIMULATION INTÉGRÉE | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 09.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2022 | 15.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23157784.2 / EP4212978 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | IT | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IE | 06.07.2023 | LU | 06.07.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04248636 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 2,5* the whole document *; | [A]EP0660210 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO02079885 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2007100478 (EGELAND OLAV [NO], et al) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,5,6; | [A]WO2010116491 (SYSTEMV INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | Examination | US6088630 | US2005071037 | EP1768006 | US2010030373 | US2010174395 | US2010222899 |