EP2737260 - DEVICE FOR STORING RENEWABLE ENERGY IN THE FORM OF HEAT AND METHOD FOR REGENERATION BY TRIGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzanne, Jacquis 3 rue des Agaves 97411 Bois De Nefles-Saint-Paul / FR | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Ipside 29, rue de Lisbonne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Deschamps, Samuel Cabinet Schmit-Chretien 16 rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12740943.1 | 25.07.2012 | WO2012EP64571 | Priority number, date | FR20110002326 | 26.07.2011 Original published format: FR 1102326 | [2014/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013014178 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2737260 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24H7/04, F28D20/00, F01K3/16, F24D11/00 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
F28D20/0056 (EP);
F24D18/00 (EP,US);
F01K13/00 (EP);
F22B27/16 (EP);
F24D11/0214 (EP);
F24D3/08 (EP);
F24H7/04 (EP);
F24D2101/10 (EP,US);
F24D2101/40 (EP,US);
F24D2103/13 (EP,US);
F24D2103/17 (EP,US);
F24D2200/126 (EP);
F28D2020/0078 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP);
Y02E70/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPEICHERN ERNEUERBARER ENERGIE IN FORM VON WÄRME UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERATION DURCH TRIGENERATION | [2014/23] | English: | DEVICE FOR STORING RENEWABLE ENERGY IN THE FORM OF HEAT AND METHOD FOR REGENERATION BY TRIGENERATION | [2014/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DES ENERGIES RENOUVELABLES SOUS LA FORME DE CHALEUR ET LE PROCEDE DE RESTITUTION EN TRI GENERATION | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 01.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2727790 (CYTHELIA SARL [FR]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2732170 (GUYONNEAU CLAUDE [FR]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2006007733 (NEW WORLD GENERATION INC [CA], et al) [I] 12-18 * page 1, line 31 - page 3, line 18 * * page 5, line 14 - page 8, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [I]WO2006072185 (NEW WORLD GENERATION INC [CA], et al) [I] 12-18 * page 2, line 26 - page 5, line 27 * * figures 1-3 *; | [AD]FR2922608 (SAIPEM S A SA [FR]) [AD] 1-18* the whole document *; | [AD]FR2927959 (SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS EN DEV SOC PA [FR]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2941574 (URBAN FABRICE [FR]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2727790 | FR2732170 | WO2006007733 | WO2006072185 | FR2922608 | FR2927959 | FR2941574 |