EP2726428 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/19] | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE APPARATUS | ||
[2022/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALAMAN AGUILAR, Jorge Madre Vedruna 6 4ºD 50008 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
ALONSO ESTEBAN, Rafael Ricardo del arco nº 18 4ºA 22004 Huesca / ES | 03 /
BUÑUEL MAGDALENA, Miguel Angel Julian Sanz Ibañez 42-8ºF 50017 Zaragoza / ES | 04 /
CARRETERO CHAMARRO, Enrique 34 4ºA Avda Almozara 50003 Zaragoza / ES | 05 /
ESTER SOLA, Francisco Javier San Jorge 33-Esc.Dcha.-7ºDcha 50001 Zaragoza / ES | 06 /
PELAYO ZUECO, Francisco Javier C/ Andrés Gurpide 7 3ºD 50008 Zaragoza / ES | 07 /
PEREZ CABEZA, Pilar Residencial Paraiso Nº2 esc. C 4ºA 50008 Zaragoza / ES | 08 /
PLANAS LAYUNTA, Fernando C/ Violante de Hungría 10 Esc. Dcha. 11º D. 50009 Zaragoza / ES | 09 /
SUBIAS DOMINGO, Jesus Mario C/ Tenor Fleta 57 esc. Izqda ático 2 50008 Zaragoza / ES | 10 /
VILLUENDAS YUSTE, Francisco c/ Duquesa Villahermosa 119 C1 2ºA. 50009 Zaragoza / ES | [2014/19] | Application number, filing date | 12741384.7 | 20.06.2012 | [2022/50] | WO2012IB53099 | Priority number, date | ES20110031089U | 29.06.2011 Original published format: ES 201131089 U | [2014/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013001414 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2726428 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2726428 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/10, C03C17/34 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
F24C15/102 (EP,ES);
C03C17/3435 (EP);
C03C17/36 (ES);
C03C17/3602 (ES);
F24C15/10 (ES);
H05B6/12 (ES);
H05B6/1209 (ES)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | C03C17/245, H05B3/74, F24C15/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSGERÄT | [2022/31] | English: | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE | [2022/30] | French: | APPAREIL MÉNAGER | [2014/19] |
Former [2014/19] | HAUSGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2014/19] | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE APPARATUS | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 25.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2022 | 13.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | ES | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | IT | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | NO | 14.03.2023 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | GB | 20.06.2023 | IE | 20.06.2023 | LU | 20.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
GB | 20.06.2023 | ||
IE | 20.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
IE | 20.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
LU | 20.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 14.12.2022 | |
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | |
NO | 14.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE10112234 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * [Y] 3-8; | [Y]JP2010159171 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [Y] 4,5,7* abstract *; | [Y]WO2011020718 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [Y] 3,6-8 * page 4, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 1 * | Examination | WO9011671 | DE69100010T | US2008190409 | EP2243752 |