EP2670331 - MEDICAL ABLATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/50] | MEDICAL ABLATION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE | ||
[2023/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arqos Surgical, Inc. 20195 Stevens Creek Blvd Suite 120 Cupertino, CA 95014-2380 / US | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERMAIN, Aaron 3563 S. Bascom Avenue Apt. 2 Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
LESKO, Balazs Pokmaniczky Utca 77. Iii/5. H-1064 Budapest / HU | 03 /
ORCZY-TIMKO, Benedek Ruszti Street 10 H-1022 Budapest / HU | 04 /
TRUCKAI, Csaba 19566 Arden Court Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/40] |
Former [2013/50] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12742325.9 | 31.01.2012 | [2023/40] | WO2012US23390 | Priority number, date | US201161439531P | 04.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161439531 P | US201161454901P | 21.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161454901 P | US201161491541P | 31.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161491541 P | US201161537483P | 21.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161537483 P | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012106371 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670331 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670331 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
A61B18/042 (EP);
A61B2018/00565 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP);
A61B2218/002 (EP);
A61B2218/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES Ablationssystem | [2023/18] | English: | MEDICAL ABLATION SYSTEM | [2023/18] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ABLATION MÉDICALE | [2023/18] |
Former [2013/50] | MEDIZINISCHES ABLEITUNGSSYSTEM UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2013/50] | MEDICAL ABLATION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE | ||
Former [2013/50] | SYSTÈME D'ABLATION MÉDICALE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 01.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2021 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2018 | 31.01.2021 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | LU | 31.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
IT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
MC | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
IT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006224154 (SHADDUCK JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11 * figure 26 * * paragraph [0085] *; | [X]WO2007143445 (ARTHROCARE CORP, et al) [X] 1-4,10,11 * figures 3,4 * * figure 7b * * page 4, lines 29-30 * * page 5, lines 7-12 * * page 5, lines 23-26 * * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 16 * * page 11, lines 1-13 *; | [X]US2008132826 (SHADDUCK JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11 * figure 12 * * paragraphs [0051] , [0053] , [0056] * * paragraph [0063] *; | [XI]US2009270849 (TRUCKAI CSABA [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11 * figures 27a,31 * * paragraphs [0134] , [0135] * * paragraph [0144] * * paragraphs [0146] - [0149] * * paragraph [0153] * [I] 8,9; | [A]DE102009002278 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 9 ** paragraph [0069] * | International search | [X]US2006224154 (SHADDUCK JOHN H [US], et al); | [Y]US2009076498 (SAADAT VAHID [US], et al); | [X]US2010100091 (TRUCKAI CSABA [US]) | Examination | US6099523 | by applicant | US2006224154 | WO2007143445 | US2008132826 | US2009270849 | DE102009002278 | - EDWARDS, R, "Thermal Chondroplasty of Chondromalacic Human Cartilage An Ex Vivo Comparison of Bipolar and Monopolar Radiofrequency Devices", The American Journal of Sports Medicine, (20020000), vol. 30, no. 1, page 90 |