EP2671301 - ENERGY INTERFACE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milbank Manufacturing Co. 4801 Deramus Avenue Kansas City, MO 64120 / US | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIGLOCK, John V. 4029 Bennington 104 Kansas City, Missouri 64117 / US | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12742540.3 | 30.01.2012 | WO2012US23155 | Priority number, date | US201161438179P | 31.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161438179 P | US201261591035P | 26.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261591035 P | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012106252 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2671301 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/14, H02J13/00, H02J3/32, H02J3/38, H02J9/06, H02J9/08 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
H02J13/00024 (EP,US);
H02J13/00007 (EP,US);
H02J13/00026 (EP,US);
H02J13/00034 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J9/061 (US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
H02J2300/40 (EP);
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J9/08 (EP,US);
Y02B10/70 (US);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US);
Y02E10/76 (EP,US);
Y02E40/70 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP,US);
Y04S10/123 (EP,US);
Y04S10/14 (EP,US);
Y04S20/12 (EP,US);
Y04S20/20 (EP);
Y04S20/248 (EP);
Y04S40/121 (EP,US);
Y04S40/126 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/50] | H02J3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | ENERGIESCHNITTSTELLENSYSTEM | [2013/50] | English: | ENERGY INTERFACE SYSTEM | [2013/50] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INTERFACE ÉNERGÉTIQUE | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 26.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007135971 (ANDARAWIS EMAD A [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0020] , [0024] , [0029] , [0032]; figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 15; | [Y]US2007222295 (WAREHAM PAUL [CA], et al) [Y] 15* paragraph [0027] * | International search | [Y]US2007155349 (NELSON MARK E [US], et al); | [Y]US7446437 (PAIK NAMWOOK [US], et al); | [X]US7566986 (DEBOER JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US2010002348 (DONOLO MARCOS A [US], et al); | [Y]US2010198535 (BROWN KENNETH [US], et al) |