EP2748003 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A PARTICULAR POSITION OF AT LEAST ONE TYPE AREA ON A WEB OF MATERIAL TO BE IMPRINTED WITH AT LEAST ONE PRINT IMAGE IN A PRINTING PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOF, Andreas, Hugo Rieslingstr. 14 67454 Hassloch / DE | 02 /
KLÜPFEL, Elmar, Norbert Kirchheimer Str. 11 97271 Kleinrinderfeld / DE | [2015/29] |
Former [2014/27] | 01 /
HOF, Andreas, Hugo Isenachstraße 30 67227 Frankenthal / DE | ||
02 /
KLÜPFEL, Elmar, Norbert Kirchheimer Str. 11 97271 Kleinrinderfeld / DE | Representative(s) | Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 12743108.8 | 19.07.2012 | WO2012EP64194 | Priority number, date | DE20111081619 | 26.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011081619 | [2014/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013029870 | Date: | 07.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2748003 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2748003 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/60, B41F33/00, B65H23/188 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
B41F13/60 (EP);
B41F33/0081 (EP);
B65H23/1882 (EP);
B65H45/28 (EP);
B65H2301/5151 (EP);
B65H2511/512 (EP);
B65H2801/21 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FESTLEGUNG EINER JEWEILIGEN POSITION VON MINDESTENS EINEM SATZSPIEGEL AUF EINER IN EINER DRUCKMASCHINE MIT MINDESTENS EINEM DRUCKBILD ZU BEDRUCKENDEN MATERIALBAHN | [2014/27] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A PARTICULAR POSITION OF AT LEAST ONE TYPE AREA ON A WEB OF MATERIAL TO BE IMPRINTED WITH AT LEAST ONE PRINT IMAGE IN A PRINTING PRESS | [2014/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER CHAQUE POSITION D'AU MOINS UNE SURFACE D'IMPRESSION SUR UNE BANDE DE MATÉRIAU SUR LAQUELLE AU MOINS UNE IMAGE DOIT ÊTRE IMPRIMÉE DANS UNE MACHINE D'IMPRESSION | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 05.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2012 | AL | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | HR | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | MK | 15.07.2015 | MT | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | RS | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | SM | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | IE | 19.07.2015 | LU | 19.07.2015 | BE | 31.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | NO | 15.10.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | IS | 15.11.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 19.07.2012 | |
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 15.07.2015 | |
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP1167035 (TOKYO KIKAI SEISAKUSHO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,9,11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0086] * [Y] 8 [I] 2-5,10,12-17; | [I]WO2006117291 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [I] 1 * page 9, line 27 - page 17, line 15 *; | [Y]EP1886954 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0007] * | by applicant | WO2006117291 |