EP2742476 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A PATH OF A BILLBOARD AUDIENCE GROUP AND PROVIDING ADVERTISING CONTENT BASED ON THE PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, Avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATHYANATH, Ajay 1305 Maplecrest Road Edison, NJ 08820 / US | 02 /
NANDAGOPAL, Thyagarajan 2405 Terra Cotta Circle Herndon, VA 20171 / US | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Dearling, Bruce Clive Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12743586.5 | 17.07.2012 | WO2012US46984 | Priority number, date | US201161521407P | 09.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161521407 P | US201213538155 | 29.06.2012 Original published format: US201213538155 | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013022561 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2742476 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES WEGES EINES ZIELGRUPPE EINER REKLAMETAFEL UND BEREITSTELLUNG VON WERBUNGSINHALT JE NACH DEM WEG | [2014/25] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A PATH OF A BILLBOARD AUDIENCE GROUP AND PROVIDING ADVERTISING CONTENT BASED ON THE PATH | [2014/25] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN TRAJET D'UN GROUPE D'AUDIENCE DE PANNEAU-RÉCLAME ET DE FOURNITURE D'UN CONTENU PUBLICITAIRE SUR LA BASE DU TRAJET | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 18.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IP]US2012150654 (SATHYANATH AJAY [US], et al) [IP] 1-10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0035] , [0036] , [0040] , [0041] , [0046]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2009254416 (NOMULA JAGADESHWAR R [US]) [I] 10 * abstract *; | [A]US2009319166 (KHOSRAVY MOE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0077] , [0078] *; | [A]US2003046158 (KRATKY JAN JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0014] * | [AP] - Liebig T, "Trajectory regression model for indoor pedestrian flow analysis on billboard evaluation", Proceedings of the Third International Conference on Applied Operation Research (ICAOR'11), 24-26 August 2011, Istanbul, Turkey, (20110824), URL: http://www.thomas-liebig.eu/wordpress/wp-content/papercite-data/pdf/liebig11.pdf, (20151013), XP055220274 [AP] 1-10 * sections 1, 2, 4.1 * | [AP] - UTSCH P ET AL, "Monitoring microscopic pedestrian mobility using bluetooth", 2012 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ENVIRONMENTS, 26-29 JUNE 2012, (20120626), doi:10.1109/IE.2012.32, ISBN 978-1-4673-2093-1, pages 173 - 177, XP032218218 [AP] 1-10 * sections I, II, IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IE.2012.32 | International search | [X]US2011087431 (GUPTA RAJARSHI [US], et al); | [Y]US2010083169 (ATHSANI ATHELLINA [US], et al); | [Y]US2008016055 (RIISE SOREN [GB], et al); | [A]US2011047509 (ARRASVUORI JUHA [FI]) |