EP2740161 - PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE WITH HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicaise, Noël Les boisdons 16 Rond Point du Bohios 16730 Linars / FR | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Maupilier, Didier Schmit Chretien 111 Cours du Médoc CS 40009 33070 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12743722.6 | 03.08.2012 | WO2012EP65212 | Priority number, date | FR20110002437 | 04.08.2011 Original published format: FR 1102437 | [2014/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013017677 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2740161 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/058, F24J2/04, H01L31/052 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
H01L31/0521 (US);
H02S40/44 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP);
Y02E10/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Title | German: | PHOTOVOLTAISCHES MODUL MIT EINEM WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2014/24] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE WITH HEAT EXCHANGER | [2014/24] | French: | MODULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE AVEC ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE | [2014/24] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 09.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005028967 (TRIMBOLI LONGUETTO ANTONINO AD [ES]) [Y] 1-14 * figure - *; | [Y]US2009293939 (ZHANG JIWEN [CN], et al) [Y] 1-14 * figure - *; | [A]EP1693901 (BIUCCHI SERGIO [IT], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2011014120 (GRENZONE PTE LTD [SG]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO03100866 (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * | Examination | US2010154866 | by applicant | FR2924664 | FR2779275 | WO0199203 | WO2007129985 | WO2008044250 | WO2008125264 | EP1693901 |