EP2730150 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING THE OPERATIONAL RELIABILITY OF AT LEAST ONE PASSIVE ELECTRODE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/20] | METHOD FOR MONITORING THE OPERATIONAL RELIABILITY OF AT LEAST ONE PASSIVE ELECTRODE AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING THE OPERATIONAL RELIABILITY OF AT LEAST ONE PASSIVE ELECTRODE | ||
[2018/51] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HISAM, Joachim Dinkelbergstr. 36 79540 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Udo Burgunderstr. 19a 79395 Neuenburg am Rhein / DE | 03 /
VINNAY, Thomas Wasserklammstr. 10 77933 Lahr / DE | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Anwaltssozietät GbR Depotstr. 5 1/2 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12743810.9 | 27.06.2012 | WO2012US44460 | Priority number, date | DE20111078603 | 04.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011078603 | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013006348 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730150 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05F3/02 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
H05F3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERWACHEN DER BETRIEBSSICHERHEIT MINDESTENS EINER PASSIVEN ELEKTRODE. | [2018/51] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING THE OPERATIONAL RELIABILITY OF AT LEAST ONE PASSIVE ELECTRODE. | [2018/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SURVEILLER LA FIABILITE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'AU MOINS UNE ELECTRODE PASSIVE. | [2018/51] |
Former [2014/20] | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER BETRIEBSSICHERHEIT MINDESTENS EINER PASSIVEN ELEKTRODE SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER BETRIEBSSICHERHEIT MINDESTENS EINER PASSIVEN ELEKTRODE | ||
Former [2014/20] | METHOD FOR MONITORING THE OPERATIONAL RELIABILITY OF AT LEAST ONE PASSIVE ELECTRODE AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING THE OPERATIONAL RELIABILITY OF AT LEAST ONE PASSIVE ELECTRODE | ||
Former [2014/20] | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA FIABILITÉ FONCTIONNELLE D'AU MOINS UNE ÉLECTRODE PASSIVE ET APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA FIABILITÉ FONCTIONNELLE D'AU MOINS UNE ÉLECTRODE PASSIVE | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 09.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2397124 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,3,6-9,11 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 24 * * page 4, lines 15-40; figure . * [I] 2,4,5,10; | [XI]WO2008099515 (OKANO KAZUO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * the whole document *[I] 4,7,11 |