EP2673725 - ELECTRIC FIELD CONTROL OF TWO OR MORE RESPONSES IN A COMBUSTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clearsign Combustion Corporation 12870 Interuban Avenue South Seattle, WA 98168 / US | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTWICK, Thomas, S. 10510 196th St. SE Snohomish, WA 98296 / US | 02 /
GOODSON, David, B. 4739 44th Avenue S.W. Unit 302 Seattle, WA 98116 / US | 03 /
WIKLOF, Christopher, A. 3531 99th St. Se Everett, WA 98208 / US | 04 /
COLANNINO, Joseph 2836 78th Ave. Se 502 Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Depotstrasse 5 1/2 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12744602.9 | 09.02.2012 | WO2012US24541 | Priority number, date | US201161441229P | 09.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161441229 P | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012109481 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2673725 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, F24C3/12, F23C99/00, F23N5/26 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
F23C99/001 (EP,US);
F24C3/12 (KR);
B01J7/00 (KR);
F23C5/14 (US);
F23D14/84 (EP,US);
F23N5/265 (US);
Y10T137/0391 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/51] | G06F19/00, F24C3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | KONTROLLE VON ZWEI ODER MEHR REAKTIONEN IN EINEM VERBRENNUNGSSYSTEM MITHILFE EINES ELEKTRISCHEN FELDES | [2013/51] | English: | ELECTRIC FIELD CONTROL OF TWO OR MORE RESPONSES IN A COMBUSTION SYSTEM | [2013/51] | French: | COMMANDE DE CHAMP ÉLECTRIQUE D'AU MOINS DEUX RÉPONSES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMBUSTION | [2013/51] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 19.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2019 | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/09] | 20.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 31.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2011027734 (HARTWICK THOMAS S [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-13,15-17 * page 1, paragraph 20 - page 5, paragraph 56 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 9 [I] 14; | [XY]US2005208442 (HEILIGERS ROLF [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,8 * page 2, paragraph 10 - paragraph 12 * * page 7, paragraph 162 - paragraph 164 * * figures 6a,6b * [Y] 9; | [X]US2007020567 (BRANSTON DAVID W [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,8 * page 2, paragraph 20 - paragraph 22 * * page 2, paragraph 26 - paragraph 32 * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US6887069 (THORNTON JIMMY D [US], et al); | [Y]US5288303 (WORACEK DAVID L [US], et al); | [Y]US7137808 (BRANSTON DAVID WALTER [DE], et al); | [Y]US7770380 (DULLIGAN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US5654868 (BUER RICHARD W [US]); | [Y]US7128818 (KHESIN MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US3957418 (SATA NAOYASU); | [Y]US4842190 (ORCHARD KENNETH L [US]) |