EP2657110 - STRUCTURE FOR FRONT SIDE FRAMES OF AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTA Yoshikatsu c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Prechtel, Jörg Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12744661.5 | 27.01.2012 | WO2012JP51805 | Priority number, date | JP20110026085 | 09.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011026085 | JP20110028503 | 14.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011028503 | [2013/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012108282 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2657110 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20, B62D21/15, B62D29/00, C21D9/00, C21D9/08 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
B62D21/152 (EP,US);
B62D21/15 (US);
B62D25/20 (EP,US);
B62D29/007 (EP,US);
C21D1/10 (EP,US);
C21D9/085 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | B62D25/20, B62D21/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR FÜR DEN VORDEREN SEITENRAHMEN EINES AUTOMOBILS | [2013/44] | English: | STRUCTURE FOR FRONT SIDE FRAMES OF AUTOMOBILE | [2013/44] | French: | STRUCTURE POUR CADRES LATÉRAUX AVANT D'AUTOMOBILE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2013 | Translation filed | 23.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 08.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3827712 (SUZUKI I, et al) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 49-59 - column 2, lines 27-38; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US4424986 (MIZUNO KAZUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 55-68; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US6203098 (MOTOZAWA YASUKI [JP], et al) [A] 7-11 * figures 1,2,6; claims 3,5,8 *; | [A]US2002163226 (SHIBATA KOJI [JP]) [A] 7,10,11* paragraph [0046]; figures 1a,1b,2,3,7,8,9 *; | [A]EP1426270 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 7,8 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US2005151394 (GRUENEKLEE AXEL [DE], et al) [A] 7-10 * paragraphs [0021] , [0036] , [ 038] , [0041]; figures 2, 10,11,12; claims 16-18, 20,22,23,25 *; | [A]JP2005225253 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 7,8 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1363826 (MAGNA INT INC [CA]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0013] , [0015]; figures 1,5,6; claims 4,7,9,18,19,22 *; | [Y]JP2007045261 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [§034] - [0035]; figures 1,2,4,6,13, *; | [A]WO2008020143 (RENAULT SA [FR], et al) [A] 7,10 * figures 2,4 *; | [Y]EP2070805 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 4 * figures 15A,15B *; | [A]JP2010000873 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] - [0021] - [0022] - [0046] - [0048]; figures 1,2,6,8 *; | [Y]EP2143621 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0083]; figures 10,30-39; claims 9,10 *; | [E]US2012187719 (FUJII TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [E] 1 * Potential use for determining unity of invention between claims 1 and 7;; figures 3,4,7,9A-C *; | [E]EP2671778 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 7-11 * paragraphs 051,079,085, - column 17, line 2; figures 2, 3A-D,9,12,13 * | International search | [Y]JPS49133323U (FUJI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.); | [Y]JPS5747480U (TOYOTA MOTOR CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPS6467482 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JPH0986438 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2003095132 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JP2004083931 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JP2004188998 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2004352092 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2007112212 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2008105517 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP, et al); | [Y]WO2008123505 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) |