EP2725896 - DEVICE FOR CATCHING INSECTS AND SMALL ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flymoeli Systems GmbH Wutzlhofen Nr. 22&22A 93057 Regensburg / DE | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEUBECK, Markus, A. Wutzlhofen 22 93057 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
SCHEUBECK, Thomas, M. Wutzlhofen 22 93057 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
SCHEUBECK, Irmgard, C. Wutzlhofen 22 93057 Regensburg / DE | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12745414.8 | 29.06.2012 | WO2012EP62734 | Priority number, date | DE201110107823 | 01.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011107823 | [2014/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013004625 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2725896 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/10, A01M1/04 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
A01M1/106 (EP);
A01M1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FANGEN VON INSEKTEN UND KLEINTIEREN | [2014/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR CATCHING INSECTS AND SMALL ANIMALS | [2014/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ À LA CAPTURE D'INSECTES ET DE PETITS ANIMAUX | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 01.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB298750 (FRED MAUDE SIMPSON) [X] 1,3-9 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2328135 (SHUI FONG CHEMICAL CORP [TW]) [X] 1,3-9 * page 2 - page 4; figures 2,5,6 *; | [X]WO9952352 (AGRISENSE BCS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,10* page 4 - page 5; figure 1 * |