EP2736706 - A DEVICE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A BONDED COMPONENT AND ALSO A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2014/23] | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARDENHAGEN, Heinz Gartenstrasse 25 21680 Stade / DE | 02 /
SUESSMUTH, Karsten Hohenwedeler Weg 95 21682 Stade / DE | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Kopf Westenberger Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/23] | Marschall, Stefan Elbpatent Marschall und Partner Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12745445.2 | 27.07.2012 | [2016/52] | WO2012EP64834 | Priority number, date | DE20111079931 | 27.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011079931 | US201161512003P | 27.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161512003 P | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013014289 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2736706 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2736706 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/10, B29C70/46, B29C70/44 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
B29C70/46 (EP,US);
B29C70/443 (EP,US);
B32B37/1018 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/23] | B29C70/44, B29C70/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GEBUNDENEN KOMPONENTE UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/23] | English: | A DEVICE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A BONDED COMPONENT AND ALSO A METHOD | [2014/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT LIÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2016/32] |
Former [2014/23] | DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT FIXÉ ET ÉGALEMENT PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2012 | AL | 28.12.2016 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | RS | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | GB | 27.07.2017 | IE | 27.07.2017 | LU | 27.07.2017 | MT | 27.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | FR | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.07.2012 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
TR | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.07.2012 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.07.2012 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.07.2012 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 28.12.2016 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2010015783 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,8,9 * figure 2 * * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 7, lines 10-14 * * page 8, lines 1-15 * [I] 2,4-7; | [I]US2010098927 (BOYD JACK DOUGLAS [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * figure 3A ** page 7, paragraph [0066] * | Examination | US6620369 | US2010098906 |