EP2730027 - PIPELINE POWER GATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. 2485 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/18] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. 2485 Austine Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. One AMD Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAILEY, Daniel W. 9716 Tree Bend Drive Austin, Texas 78750 / US | 02 /
ROGERS, Aaron S. 203 Plumbago Drive Pflugerville, Texas 78660 / US | 03 /
MONTANARO, James J. 6205 Diamond Head Circle Austin, Texas 78746 / US | 04 /
BURGESS, Bradley G. 21 Sunset Trail Austin, Texas 78745 / US | 05 /
HANNAN, Peter J. 4405 Sacred Arrow Drive Austin, Texas 78735 / US | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1EE / GB | ||
Former [2014/20] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 46 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12745584.8 | 05.07.2012 | [2018/36] | WO2012US45559 | Priority number, date | US201113176842 | 06.07.2011 Original published format: US201113176842 | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013006702 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730027 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2730027 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/00 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
H03K19/0013 (EP,US);
H03K19/0016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRLEITUNGS-STROMEINGANGSMODUL | [2014/20] | English: | PIPELINE POWER GATING | [2014/20] | French: | PORTILLONNAGE DE COURANT EN PIPELINE | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2012 | AL | 05.09.2018 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | IT | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | MT | 05.09.2018 | NL | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SE | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | NO | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.07.2012 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
MT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 05.07.2012 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1195902 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053]; figure 9 *; | [A]US2007024318 (MAMIDIPAKA MAHESH [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A] - LI LI ET AL, "Effective algorithm for integrating clock gating and power gating to reduce dynamic and active leakage power simultaneously", QUALITY ELECTRONIC DESIGN (ISQED), 2011 12TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20110314), doi:10.1109/ISQED.2011.5770706, ISBN 978-1-61284-913-3, pages 1 - 6, XP031869212 [A] 1-10 * figures 5,6,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISQED.2011.5770706 |