EP2675351 - SYSTEM, HANDHELD DIAGNOSTICS DEVICE AND METHODS FOR PERFORMING AN AUTOMATIC AND REMOTE TRAINED PERSONNEL GUIDED NON-INVASIVE MEDICAL EXAMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/52] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING AN AUTOMATIC AND REMOTE TRAINED PERSONNEL GUIDED MEDICAL EXAMINATION | ||
[2020/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyto Care Ltd. P.O. Box 8299 Poleg Industrial Area 8299 Netanya / IL | [2021/25] |
Former [2019/08] | For all designated states Tyto Care Ltd. P.O. Box 8299 Poleg Industrial Area 8299 Netanya / IL | ||
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Eon Medical Ltd. P.O. Box 8299 Poleg Industrial Area 8299 Netanya / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILAD-GILOR, David 23 Hamaapilim Street 40500 Even Yehuda / IL | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/25] |
Former [2013/52] | Jaeger, Michael David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12747320.5 | 16.02.2012 | [2021/25] | WO2012IL50051 | Priority number, date | US201161443788P | 17.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161443788 P | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012111013 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675351 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2675351 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06, G16H30/20, G16H40/63, G16H40/67, G16H50/20, // A61B5/00 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
A61B5/0013 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (US);
A61B5/0077 (EP,US);
A61B5/067 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/684 (EP,US);
A61B5/742 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | A61B5/06, G06F19/00, // A61B5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/52] | A61B5/0404 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, HANDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER AUTOMATISCHEN UND REMOTE DURCH GESCHULTES PERSONAL ERFOLGENDEN NICHTINVASIVEN MEDIZINISCHEN UNTERSUCHUNG | [2020/50] | English: | SYSTEM, HANDHELD DIAGNOSTICS DEVICE AND METHODS FOR PERFORMING AN AUTOMATIC AND REMOTE TRAINED PERSONNEL GUIDED NON-INVASIVE MEDICAL EXAMINATION | [2020/50] | French: | SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF À MAIN ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'EXÉCUTER UN EXAMEN MÉDICAL NON INVASIVE AUTOMATIQUE ET DISTANT GUIDÉ PAR UN PERSONNEL QUALIFIÉ | [2020/50] |
Former [2013/52] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER AUTOMATISCHEN UND REMOTE DURCH GESCHULTES PERSONAL ERFOLGENDEN MEDIZINISCHEN UNTERSUCHUNG | ||
Former [2013/52] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING AN AUTOMATIC AND REMOTE TRAINED PERSONNEL GUIDED MEDICAL EXAMINATION | ||
Former [2013/52] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'EXÉCUTER UN EXAMEN MÉDICAL AUTOMATIQUE ET DISTANT GUIDÉ PAR UN PERSONNEL QUALIFIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 15.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21174138.4 / EP3957242 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.06.2021 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | ES | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | IT | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | NL | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | IE | 16.02.2022 | LU | 16.02.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 16.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
IT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 23.06.2021 | |
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 23.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011001301 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-40 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0039]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2004019270 (TAKEUCHI TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1-40 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] - [0040] - [0042] - [0047] - [0063] - [0068] - [0070]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2011015504 (YOO JAE CHERN [KR]) [X] 1-40 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0135]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2007293721 (GILBOA PINHAS [IL]) [X] 1-40 * paragraphs [0114] , [0121] , [0129] - [0130] - [0133] - [0135] - [0139] - [0169]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO2007061890 (CALYPSO MED TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * paragraphs [0043] - [0046] - [0056] , [0060] - [0069] - [0075] - [0086] - [0093] - [0094] - [0130]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2004073455 (MCCONNOCHIE KENNETH M [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0041]; figure -; claim - * | International search | [X]US2011015504 (YOO JAE CHERN [KR]); | [Y]US2006155589 (LANE JOHN A [US], et al); | [Y]US2005273359 (YOUNG DAVID E [US]); | [A]US2002188227 (CHONG HOON [KR], et al); | [A]US2007088521 (SHMUELI RAM [IL], et al) | Examination | JP2010119625 | US2010016668 | by applicant | US5527261 | WO2011001301 | US2004019270 | US2011015504 | US2007293721 | WO2007061890 | US2004073455 |