EP2677004 - PHOTOCURABLE FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR CURED FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Corporation 5-1, Nihonbashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2018/38] |
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1 Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA Naoya c/o Chemical Research Laboratories NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 10-1 Tsuboi-Nishi 2-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-8507 / JP | 02 /
OZAWA Masaaki c/o Chemical Research Laboratories NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 10-1 Tsuboi-Nishi 2-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-8507 / JP | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12747360.1 | 15.02.2012 | WO2012JP53450 | Priority number, date | JP20110029678 | 15.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011029678 | JP20120008552 | 19.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012008552 | [2013/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012111682 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2677004 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L79/04, C08F20/20, C08G59/50, H01L21/312 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
C08G73/0644 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F226/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (CN);
C08G59/42 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/5086 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/56 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/0273 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/34924 (CN);
C08L63/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L79/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08J2379/04 (CN);
C08J2463/00 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/34924, C08L79/04 (CN);
C08L79/04, C08L63/00 (US,CN,EP);
C08L63/00, C08L79/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Title | German: | LLCHTHÄRTBARE FILMBILDENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEHÄRTETEN FILMS | [2013/52] | English: | PHOTOCURABLE FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR CURED FILM | [2013/52] | French: | COMPOSITION FILMOGÈNE PHOTODURCISSABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FILM DURCI | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2013 | Translation filed | 27.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 01.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2010128661 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [XD] 1-12 * abstract *; | EP2428529 [ ] (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0073] * * page 33, line 15 - line 16 * * claims 1,10 *; | [E]EP2636697 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0069] * * examples 13,14 * * claim - *; | [A]JPH07113009 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-12 | [XP] - NAOYA NISHIMURA ET AL, "High Refractive Coating Materials Using Hyperbranched Polymers", JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (20120101), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.2494/photopolymer.25.355, ISSN 0914-9244, pages 355 - 358, XP055171307 [XP] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2494/photopolymer.25.355 | International search | [X]WO2010128661 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009271445 (KANEKA CORP); | [A]JPH07113009 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2001503077 (BAYER AG.); | [A]JP2004156001 (SANEI KAGAKU KK, et al); | [A]JP2001167885 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) | by applicant | JP2007246877 | JP2008024832 | US5886130 | JP2000053659 | WO2010128661 | - JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 106, pages 95 - 102 |