EP2678817 - A MARKET ACCESS SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zomojo Pty Ltd Level 6 76-80 Clarence Street Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Zomojo Pty Ltd Level 6 76-80 Clarence Street Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPMAN, Matthew 3/27 Byron Street Coogee, New South Wales 2034 / AU | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12749232.0 | 21.02.2012 | WO2012AU00154 | Priority number, date | AU20110200733 | 21.02.2011 Original published format: AU 2011200733 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012113013 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678817 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/04 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
G06Q40/06 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | MARKTZUGANGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2014/01] | English: | A MARKET ACCESS SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2014/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS À UN MARCHÉ | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 22.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.05.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US7685044 (ROBERTSON CHRIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 5 * [A] 15; | [IY]WO2010051575 (ZOMOJO PTY LTD [AU], et al) [I] 15 * page 3, line 4 - line 31 * * page 4, line 1 - line 5 * * page 5, line 26 - line 30 * * page 7, line 37 - page 8, line 4 * [Y] 1-14; | [A]US2009313160 (KOLTEN GENE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010208729 (ODDIE JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011010460 (LAVOIE RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Cut-through switching - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20110220), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Cut-through_switching&oldid=408908764, (20140724), XP055131511 [A] 15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US7685044 (ROBERTSON CHRIS [US], et al); | [A]US2004044794 (SRINIVASAN CHITOOR V [US]); | [A]WO2007123527 (SRINIVASAN CHITOOR V [US]) |