EP2679643 - COATING COMPOSITION, PLASTIC LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA Corporation 2-7-5 Naka-Ochiai Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE Makoto c/o HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Naka-Ochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | 02 /
SATO Daisuke c/o HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Naka-Ochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12749736.0 | 27.02.2012 | WO2012JP54833 | Priority number, date | JP20110039844 | 25.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011039844 | [2014/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012115271 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679643 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/00, C09D5/00, C09D5/24, C09D7/12, C09D165/00, C09D175/04, G02B1/10, C09D133/08, C08L33/08, C08J7/04 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C09D133/08 (EP,US);
C08J7/042 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C09D165/00 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
C09D5/24 (EP,US);
G02B1/10 (EP,US);
G02B1/16 (US);
C08G2261/3223 (EP,US);
C08J2433/08 (EP,US);
C08J2465/00 (EP,US);
C08J2475/04 (EP,US);
C08L2201/54 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D133/08, C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C09D133/08, C08L65/00 (US,EP);
C09D165/00, C08K3/22, C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C09D165/00, C08L33/08 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2014/01] | C09D133/00, C09D5/00, C09D5/24, C09D7/12, C09D165/00, C09D175/04, G02B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND KUNSTSTOFFLINSE DAMIT | [2014/01] | English: | COATING COMPOSITION, PLASTIC LENS | [2014/01] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT, LENTILLE EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2013 | Translation filed | 25.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 14.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2009083455 (TORAY SAEHAN INC) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0035] * * claims 1-4 * [Y] 5; | [X]KR20090073619 (DOOSAN CORP [KR]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 13] , [0 16] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * example 1 * * paragraphs [0059] - [0060] *; | [Y]US2010279089 (NAITO SHUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * page 1, paragraphs 2,14-16 * * page 2, paragraphs 18,26 * * page 3, paragraph 39 - paragraph 40 * * claims 2,7-9 *; | [XP]JP2011131409 (TOYO BOSEKI) [XP] 1-5 * examples 14-16 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0041] , [0042] ** paragraphs [0050] , [0051] * | International search | [X]WO2008088028 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND [JP], et al); | [X]JP2008255332 (DAEHA MANTECH CO LTD, et al); | [X]JP2009083455 (TORAY SAEHAN INC); | [X]JP2009093874 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO); | [X]JP2009256623 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND); | [Y]JP2010077438 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [X]JP2010189616 (TORAY SAEHAN INC); | [X]JP2011038002 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO); | [XP]JP2011131409 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [XP]JP2011208016 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND) | by applicant | US6852406 | JP2010528123 |