EP2679580 - THIOAMIDE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THIOAMIDE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING [(4R,6R)-6-AMINOETHYL-1,3-DIOXAN-4-YL]ACETATE DERIVATIVE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ATORVASTATIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/01] | THIOAMIDE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THIOAMIDE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING [(4R,6R)-6-AMINOETHYL-1,3-DIOXANE-4-YL]ACETATE DERIVATIVE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ATORVASTATIN | ||
[2017/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation 14-23, Kamiosaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0021 / JP | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBASAKI, Masakatsu c/o Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation 14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0021 / JP | 02 /
KUMAGAI, Naoya c/o Microbial Chemistry Research Foundation 14-23 Kamiosaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0021 / JP | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [2017/32] |
Former [2014/01] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12750077.5 | 14.02.2012 | [2017/32] | WO2012JP53323 | Priority number, date | JP20110035006 | 21.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011035006 | [2014/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012114926 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679580 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2679580 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C327/42, A61K31/40, A61P3/06, A61P13/08, A61P19/10, A61P25/28, C07D207/34, C07F7/18, C07B61/00 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
C07C327/42 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
C07B53/00 (EP,US);
C07D207/337 (US);
C07D207/34 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THIOAMIDVERBINDUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER THIOAMIDVERBINDUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON [(4R,6R)]-6-AMINOETHYL-1,3-DIOXAN-4-YL]-ACETATDERIVATEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ATORVASTATIN | [2014/01] | English: | THIOAMIDE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THIOAMIDE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING [(4R,6R)-6-AMINOETHYL-1,3-DIOXAN-4-YL]ACETATE DERIVATIVE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ATORVASTATIN | [2017/29] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE THIOAMIDE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ DE THIOAMIDE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN DÉRIVÉ D'ACÉTATE DE [(4R,6R)-6-AMINOÉTHYL- 1,3-DIOXANE-4-YLE], ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ATORVASTATINE | [2014/01] |
Former [2014/01] | THIOAMIDE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THIOAMIDE COMPOUND, METHOD FOR PRODUCING [(4R,6R)-6-AMINOETHYL-1,3-DIOXANE-4-YL]ACETATE DERIVATIVE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ATORVASTATIN | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2013 | Translation filed | 29.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 13.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2012 | AL | 09.08.2017 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | IT | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | GB | 14.02.2018 | IE | 14.02.2018 | LU | 14.02.2018 | MT | 14.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | FR | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.02.2012 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.02.2012 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [T] - YUJI KAWATO ET AL, "Streamlined Catalytic Asymmetric Synthesis of Atorvastatin", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (20130221), vol. 19, no. 12, doi:10.1002/chem.201204609, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 3802 - 3806, XP055198292 [T] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201204609 | [A] - CASAR ET AL, "Historic overview and recent advances in the synthesis of super-statins", CURRENT ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS LTD, NL, (20100101), vol. 14, no. 8, ISSN 1385-2728, pages 816 - 845, XP009158529 [A] 1-6 * page 830 - page 832 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/138527210791111858 | International search | [A] - MITSUTAKA IWATA, ET AL., "Direct Catalytic Asymmetric Aldol Reactions of Thioamides: Toward a Stereocontrolled Synthesis of 1,3-Polyols", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2009), vol. 131, no. 51, pages 18244 - 18245, XP055122579 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja909758e | [A] - "lecture no.: 30TF-am07", ABSTRACTS OF 130TH ANNUAL MEETING OF PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (20100305), vol. 2, page 122, XP008170523 | [XP] - YUJI KAWATO, ET AL., "A simplified catalytic system for direct catalytic asymmetric aldol reaction of thioamides; application to an enantioselective synthesis of atorvastatin", TETRAHEDRON, (20110526), vol. 67, no. 35, pages 6539 - 6546, XP028248806 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2011.05.109 | [XP] - "lecture no.: 31P-0202", ABSTRACTS OF 131ST ANNUAL MEETING OF PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (20110305), vol. 2, page 172, XP008170524 |