EP2745455 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AGGREGATING CARRIERS OF A BACKHAUL CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
LIN, Dexu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
DAMNJANOVIC, Jelena M. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2024/24] |
Former [2014/26] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12751202.8 | 10.08.2012 | [2024/24] | WO2012US50329 | Priority number, date | US201161524704P | 17.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161524704 P | US201213570961 | 09.08.2012 Original published format: US201213570961 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013025502 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2745455 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2745455 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/14, H04L5/00, H04L1/1829, // H04W72/00, H04L1/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04B7/2612 (KR);
H04L1/1861 (EP,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0097 (EP,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | H04L5/14, H04L5/00, H04W88/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AGGREGIEREN VON TRÄGERN EINER BACKHAUL-VERBINDUNG | [2014/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AGGREGATING CARRIERS OF A BACKHAUL CONNECTION | [2014/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR AGRÉGER LES PORTEUSES D'UNE CONNEXION TERRESTRE | [2014/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 10.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2010143867 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [I]WO2011025340 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]WO2011051921 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]WO2011052964 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [X]KR20110066108 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XPL]US2012069795 (CHUNG JAE HOON [KR], et al); | [EL]US2012236783 (PARK KYU JIN [KR], et al); |