EP2766891 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING VEHICLE ENVIRONMENT DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUSTEN, Michael Bottwarstr. 1 71679 Asperg / DE | 02 /
REPPICH, Andreas Wilhelmstrasse 43 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2014/34] | Application number, filing date | 12751499.0 | 24.08.2012 | WO2012EP66509 | Priority number, date | DE20111084275 | 11.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011084275 | [2014/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013053527 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2766891 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, G08G1/0967 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
G08G1/164 (EP,US);
G08G1/16 (US);
G08G1/0967 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEMS UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN VON FAHRZEUGUMFELDDATEN | [2014/34] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING VEHICLE ENVIRONMENT DATA | [2014/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES RELATIVES À L'ENVIRONNEMENT DU VÉHICULE | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.09.2019 | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/51] | 11.08.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 03.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0892381 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 5-7,11 * column 3, line 29 - line 42 * * column 4, line 7 - line 21 * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 7 *[A] 8,9; | [X]WO2009030523 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,10-12 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 5 - page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 2 *; | [X]DE102009016580 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,10,12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * | by applicant | EP0921509 |