EP2732432 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY ADJUSTING A FOCAL PLANE OF A DIGITAL PATHOLOGY IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN LEEUWEN, Marinus, Bastiaan c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VINK, Jelte, Peter c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2014/21] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 12753236.4 | 28.06.2012 | [2020/02] | WO2012IB53285 | Priority number, date | US201161507165P | 13.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161507165 P | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013008121 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732432 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2732432 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/50, G06T7/00 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
G02B21/16 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G02B21/244 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10056 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10148 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/21] | G06T5/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN EINSTELLUNG EINER FOKALEBENE EINES DIGITALEN KRANKHEITSBILDES | [2014/21] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY ADJUSTING A FOCAL PLANE OF A DIGITAL PATHOLOGY IMAGE | [2014/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AJUSTEMENT AUTOMATIQUE D'UN PLAN FOCAL D'UNE IMAGE PATHOLOGIQUE NUMÉRIQUE | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2012 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | IT | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | IE | 28.06.2020 | LU | 28.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 28.06.2012 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.06.2012 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2008131019 (NG YI-REN [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0107] * * figures 7-8 *; | [A] - MARC LEVOY ET AL, "Light field microscopy", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, (20060101), vol. 25, doi:10.1145/1179352.1141976, ISSN 0730-0301, page 924, XP055043351 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1141911.1141976 |