EP2747926 - CUTTING TOOL AND CUTTING INSERT HAVING A CLAMPING BORE WITH SPACED APART CLAMPING PORTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TULCHINSKY, Evgeny 22/3 Herbert Lehman Street 29033 Kiryat Yam / IL | 02 /
SATRAN, Amir 6 Moran Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/14] |
Former [2014/27] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12754102.7 | 25.07.2012 | [2018/14] | WO2012IL50273 | Priority number, date | IL20110214781 | 22.08.2011 Original published format: IL 21478111 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013027211 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747926 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2747926 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22, B23C5/08, B23C5/10, B23C5/06 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
B23C5/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23C5/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23C5/2213 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23C2200/085 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23C2200/286 (EP,CN,US);
B23C2200/287 (KR);
B23C2200/361 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23C2210/168 (EP,CN,KR,US);
Y10T407/1936 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/27] | B23C5/22, B23C5/08, B23C5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG UND SCHNEIDEINSATZ MIT EINER KLEMMBOHRUNG MIT GETRENNTEN KLEMMTEILEN | [2018/10] | English: | CUTTING TOOL AND CUTTING INSERT HAVING A CLAMPING BORE WITH SPACED APART CLAMPING PORTIONS | [2014/27] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE ET PLAQUETTE DE COUPE MUNIE D'UN TROU DE SERRAGE COMPORTANT DES PARTIES DE SERRAGE ESPACÉES | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/27] | SCHNEIDEWERKZEUG UND SCHNEIDEEINSATZ MIT EINER KLEMMBOHRUNG MIT GETRENNTEN KLEMMTEILEN | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 24.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 22.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2012 | AL | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | HR | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MK | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | RS | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | SM | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | NO | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IE | 25.07.2018 | LU | 25.07.2018 | MT | 25.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MK | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0599393 (PLANSEE TIZIT GMBH [AT]) [X] 23-27,29-31,35-37 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,7,13,19,28; | [A]US5685670 (SATRAN AMIR [IL]) [A] 7-12 * figures 3a,4a,4b *; | [XA]US2008193233 (PARK CHANG GYU [KR]) [X] 23-25,28,32,33,35-38 * figure - * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0039] * [A] 26,34; | [A]US2009196701 (WIHLBORG LENNART [SE], et al) [A] 7-12 * figure 7 *; | [X]JP2010253632 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 35-37 * figure 4 * * the whole document *; | [AP]US2012087747 (FANG X DANIEL [US], et al) [AP] 1-38* the whole document * | Examination | US2010183381 | by applicant | US5542793 | US2007286692 |